Federal National Mortgage v. Woodroffe et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage and Fannie Mae
Defendant: Rhema Progressive Inc., Rhyma Progressive Inc. and Gary Lee Woodroffe
Case Number: 8:2020cv00025
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 Verified Second Request to Take Judicial Notice by Gary Lee Woodroffe (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LD)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(MCB)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TDC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Leigh Troutman on behalf of Federal National Mortgage (Troutman, Shannon)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Lisa M Lewis of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
January 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/12/2020. (SRC)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Gary Woodroffe by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (MCB)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to grant E-Filing by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (MCB)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (MCB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (MCB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Circuit Court - Sarasota, case number 2012-CA-8232 filed in State Court on 10/11/2012. filed by Gary Lee Woodroffe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage v. Woodroffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage
Represented By: Lisa M Lewis
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Lisa M Lewis
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhema Progressive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhyma Progressive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lee Woodroffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?