Ortiz v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ortiz
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00365
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/12/2020 by Smith & Nephew, Inc. as to Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Shebib, Abood) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (BSN).
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jennifer Ortiz. (Biondolino, Amanda)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jennifer Ortiz. Related case(s): no (Biondolino, Amanda)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Smith & Nephew, Inc. (MCB)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/19/2020. (SAO)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-365-T-02TGW. (SJB)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Smith & Nephew, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16482679) filed by Jennifer Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Biondolino, Amanda) Modified on 2/18/2020 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ortiz
Represented By: Cynthia N. Sass
Represented By: Amanda L. Biondolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?