McClash et al v. Florida Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Linda Molto, Jane Von Hahmann, Joseph McClash and Joe Kane
Defendant: Florida Department of Transportation, Federal Transportation Authority, Nicole R. Nason and Kevin J. Thibault
Case Number: 8:2020cv00543
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Florida Department of Transportation, Kevin J. Thibault. (DG)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash, Linda Molto. (McClash, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash, Linda Molto. (McClash, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to File Electronically. See Order for details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/27/2020. (JMF)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Joseph McClash. (CTR)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joseph McClash. Related case(s): no (CTR)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to File Electronically by Joseph McClash. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/24/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/10/2020. (BGS)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/24/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/10/2020. (BGS)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Transportation Authority, Florida Department of Transportation, Nicole R. Nason, Kevin J. Thibault. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA60337 filed by Linda Molto, Joe Kane, Jane Von Hahmann, Joseph McClash.(TDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClash et al v. Florida Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Molto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Von Hahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McClash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole R. Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Thibault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?