BVM Management, Inc. v. Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership et al
Appellee: Valley National Bank, Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership, CPIF Lending, LLC, Jeffrey W. Warren, The Jennis Law Firm and US Lifestyles, LLC
In Re: Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership
Appellant: BVM Management, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00597
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the #7 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership, Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership, this bankruptcy appeal is dismissed with prejudice. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/9/2020. (CCB)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice by Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership, Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership. (Alpert, Adam)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffrey W. Warren, Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership, Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership. Related case(s): Yes (Alpert, Adam)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/20/2020. (SAO)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Labbee on behalf of Jeffrey W. Warren (Labbee, Laura)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lawton Alpert on behalf of Jeffrey W. Warren (Alpert, Adam)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Wayne Warren on behalf of Jeffrey W. Warren (Warren, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by BVM Management, Inc. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:16-bk-8167-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 3/13/20. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal).(BSN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BVM Management, Inc. v. Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Valley National Bank
Represented By: Chantal Pillay
Represented By: Edmund S. Whitson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Scott Alan Stichter
Represented By: Matthew Blake Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CPIF Lending, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Salzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey W. Warren
Represented By: Adam Lawton Alpert
Represented By: Laura Labbee
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Jennis Law Firm
Represented By: David Samuel Jennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Lifestyles, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Adam Lawton Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BVM Management, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?