Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Merced et al
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. and GEICO Casualty Co.
Defendant: L.M.T. Yulieta Perez Rodriguez, M.D. Victor Silva, D.C. Brock Mathieson, L.M.T. Mignelis Veliz Sosa, Yunied Mora-Jimenez, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ana Reyes, L.M.T. Jose Lopez, Caribe Health Center, Inc., L.M.T. Walter Diaz, L.P.T.A. Aisha Chirino, D.C. Stephen Diamantides, L.M.T. Maria Ramos, M.D. Kendrick Eugene Duldulao, Park Place Therapy, L.L.C., L.M.T. Carlos Barreto Figueroa, D.C. Ronald Robiner, Ana Dominguez, The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc., Bay Area Health & Rehabilitation, Inc., L.M.T. Alexis Garcia-Gamez, L.M.T. Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez, Ivette Ulloa, M.D. Luis Merced, Stephen Diamantides, Aisha Chirino, Walter Diaz, Maria Ramos, Victor Silva, Yulieta Perez Rodriguez, Carlos Barreto Figueroa, Ronald Robiner, Alexis Garcia-Gamez, Kendrick Eugene Duldulao, Jose Lopez, Mignelis Veliz Sosa, Luis Merced, Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez and Brock Mathieson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00802
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Yunied Mora-Jimenez. (Warchola, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 5, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Stephen Diamantides. (Warchola, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 5, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Alexis Garcia-Gamez. (Warchola, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #34 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Geico's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/3/2020. (GLP)
June 3, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO GEICO'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John) Modified on 6/4/2020 (DG).
June 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO GEICO'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Maria Ramos, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa. (Hrdlicka, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #30 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John) Modified on 6/2/2020 (DG).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant The Right Spinal Clinic Inc.'s answer or response due by 6/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/21/2020. (MLM)
May 21, 2020 Filing 31 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc. (Warchola, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified on 5/21/2020 (DG).
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.PRO. 12(b)(6) by Maria Ramos, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Treatment Notes)(Hrdlicka, Michael)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(a) #28 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). Motions may not exceed twenty-five pages, unless the Court grants leave. Local R. M.D. Fla. 3.01(a), (d). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss exceeds this page limit, and Defendants Therapy Center of Tampa, LLC, Luis Rodriguez, Ivette Ulloa, and Maria Ramos, L.P.T did not receive leave to file a motion in excess of this page limit. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/19/2020. (GLP)
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.PRO. 12(b)(6) by Maria Ramos, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Treatment Notes)(Hrdlicka, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew P. Baratta may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/18/2020. (MLM)
May 18, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Maria Ramos, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa. (Hrdlicka, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Andrew P. Baratta to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16821276 for $150 by Maria Ramos, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa. (Hrdlicka, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
May 18, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Michael Hrdlicka on behalf of Maria Ramos, Luis Rodriguez, Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa (Hrdlicka, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Ana Dominguez, Caribe Health Center, Inc., Aisha Chirino, and Luis Merced's answer or response due 6/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/8/2020. (MLM)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically temporary bar admission. Attorney Christian Carrazana is granted temporary admission to the Middle District of Florida Bar until June 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/8/2020. (MLM)
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ana Dominguez, Caribe Health Center, Inc., Aisha Chirino, Luis Merced. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically temporary bar admission of Christian Carranzana by Ana Dominguez, Caribe Health Center, Inc., Aisha Chirino, Luis Merced. (AG)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Carrazana on behalf of Ana Dominguez, Caribe Health Center, Inc., Aisha Chirino, Luis Merced. (AG)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant The Right Spinal Clinic's answer or response due 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/29/2020. (MLM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc.. (Warchola, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez, Jose Lopez, and Park Place Therapy, L.L.C.'s answer or response due 6/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/29/2020. (MLM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by June 26, 2020 by Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez, Jose Lopez, Park Place Therapy, L.L.C.. (Rankin, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Pearlman and Notice of Appearance by Mark P. Rankin on behalf of Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez, Jose Lopez, Park Place Therapy, L.L.C. (Rankin, Mark)
April 15, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Yonatan Bernstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060690.) Related document: #12 AMENDED MOTION to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice because of Amended Motion (Doc. 12); granting #12 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Yonatan Bernstein may appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/14/2020. (MLM)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED MOTION for Yonatan Bernstein to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Special Admission Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Marino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified event type and text per chambers on 4/14/2020 (CTR). Modified on 4/14/2020 (MLM).
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Yonatan Bernstein to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Marino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Yulieta Perez Rodriguez. (DG)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Related case(s): no (Marino, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co... (Marino, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Defendant, Yulieta Perez Rodriguez, L.M.T.)(Marino, John)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Stephen Diamantides, Ana Dominguez, Bay Area Health & Rehabilitation, Inc., Caribe Health Center, Inc., Aisha Chirino, Walter Diaz, Kendrick Eugene Duldulao, Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez, Carlos Barreto Figueroa, Alexis Garcia-Gamez, Jose Lopez, Brock Mathieson, Luis Merced, Yunied Mora-Jimenez, Park Place Therapy, L.L.C., Maria Ramos, Ana Reyes, Ronald Robiner, Luis Rodriguez, Victor Silva, Mignelis Veliz Sosa, The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc., Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C., Ivette Ulloa. (TDC)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Yonatan M. Bernstein of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/22/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/8/2020. (BGS)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/22/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/8/2020. (BGS)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-802-T-36AAS. (SJB)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16676956) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Marino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Merced et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Yulieta Perez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Victor Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. Brock Mathieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Mignelis Veliz Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunied Mora-Jimenez
Represented By: Robert R. Warchola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew P. Baratta
Represented By: Michael Hrdlicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therapy Center of Tampa, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew P. Baratta
Represented By: Michael Hrdlicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Jose Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribe Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Carrazana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Walter Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.P.T.A. Aisha Chirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. Stephen Diamantides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Maria Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Kendrick Eugene Duldulao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Place Therapy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Carlos Barreto Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. Ronald Robiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Dominguez
Represented By: Christian Carrazana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Right Spinal Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Warchola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Health & Rehabilitation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Alexis Garcia-Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M.T. Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivette Ulloa
Represented By: Andrew P. Baratta
Represented By: Michael Hrdlicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Luis Merced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Diamantides
Represented By: Robert R. Warchola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aisha Chirino
Represented By: Christian Carrazana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Ramos
Represented By: Andrew P. Baratta
Represented By: Michael Hrdlicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yulieta Perez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Barreto Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Robiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Garcia-Gamez
Represented By: Robert R. Warchola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick Eugene Duldulao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Lopez
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mignelis Veliz Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Merced
Represented By: Christian Carrazana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana Gonzalez Fernandez
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Mathieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?