Smrekar v. Alexander
Plaintiff: Robin Smrekar
Defendant: Stephanie Alexander
Case Number: 8:2020cv00881
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Stephanie Alexander. (LNR)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/11/2020. (Jung, William)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Stephanie Alexander by Robin Smrekar. (Forgione, Brandon)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Robin Smrekar. (Forgione, Brandon)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robin Smrekar. Related case(s): Yes (Forgione, Brandon)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/4/2020. (SAO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 4/29/2020 by Robin Smrekar as to Stephanie Alexander. (LNR)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF of service by Robin Smrekar (Lazarus, Jason)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Stephanie Alexander. (MCB)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-881-T-02SPF. (SJB)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephanie Alexander with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16712028) filed by Robin Smrekar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Lazarus, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smrekar v. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Smrekar
Represented By: Jason Dorian Lazarus
Represented By: Brandon George Forgione
Represented By: John Jeffrey Pankauski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?