Poelvoorde v. Unicity Solar Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donny Poelvoorde
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Matthew Selby, SPF Construction and Development, Inc., Unicity Solar Energy, LLC and Jordan Richardson
Not Classified By Court: Mark A. Hanley
Case Number: 8:2020cv00892
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Count II with Prejudice (Doc. #14) and Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, Joining in Defendants' Unopposed Motion (Doc. #16) are GRANTED. Count II of the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The parties are ordered to proceed to arbitration on the remaining claims in accordance with the terms of the arbitration agreement between them. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and deadlines and thereafter CLOSE THE CASE. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/22/2020. (SGM)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Count II with Prejudice by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Leon, Jose)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Liben M Amedie on behalf of Jordan Richardson, SPF Construction and Development, Inc., Matthew Selby, Unicity Solar Energy, LLC (Amedie, Liben)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jordan Richardson, SPF Construction and Development, Inc., Matthew Selby, Unicity Solar Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amedie, Liben)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Ignacio Leon on behalf of South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Leon, Jose)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Mark A. Hanley, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than July 20, 2020. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by June 4, 2020. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/11/2020. (SKP)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on April 30, 2020 by Donny Poelvoorde as to Jordan Richardson. (Jordan, Brianna)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on April 30, 2020 by Donny Poelvoorde as to Matthew Selby. (Jordan, Brianna)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on April,30 2020 by Donny Poelvoorde as to SPF Construction and Development, Inc. (Jordan, Brianna)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on April 30, 2020 by Donny Poelvoorde as to Unicity Solar Energy, LLC. (Jordan, Brianna)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Donny Poelvoorde. (Jordan, Brianna)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Donny Poelvoorde. Related case(s): no (Jordan, Brianna)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on April 30, 2020 by Donny Poelvoorde as to South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Jordan, Brianna)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/29/2020. (SKP)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/29/2020. (SKP)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Jordan Richardson, SPF Construction and Development, Inc., Matthew Selby, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Unicity Solar Energy, LLC. (CRH)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jordan Richardson, SPF Construction and Development, Inc., Matthew Selby, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Unicity Solar Energy, LLC Filing fee $400, receipt number TPA-60787 filed by Donny Poelvoorde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poelvoorde v. Unicity Solar Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Ignacio Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Selby
Represented By: Liben M Amedie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPF Construction and Development, Inc.
Represented By: Liben M Amedie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unicity Solar Energy, LLC
Represented By: Liben M Amedie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Richardson
Represented By: Liben M Amedie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Poelvoorde
Represented By: Brianna Arielle Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mark A. Hanley
Represented By: Mark A. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?