Spring Valley Produce, Inc. v. Central Market of FL II, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Spring Valley Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Marsha Forrest, Joseph Pavkovich, Central Market of FL II, Inc. and Nathan Forrest
Case Number: 8:2020cv00994
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER staying the case; directing the clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case; terminating #7--motion for preliminary injunction; cancelling 5/21/2020 preliminary injunction hearing scheduled before Magistrate Judge Flynn; directing counsel for Spring Valley Produce promptly and by reasonable means to inform Mr. Pavkovich both of the bankruptcy stay and of the cancellation of the hearing. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/19/2020. (BK)
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Central Market of FL II, Inc. (Tilden, Jesse) Modified on 5/18/2020 (DG).
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Marsha Forrest, Nathan Forrest. (Tilden, Jesse)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Telephonic or Video Appearance at May 21, 2020 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/14/2020. (CKR)
May 13, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Steven M. De Falco to appear telephonically or by video, and for all Counsel and Representatives, if necessary to appear telephonically or by video [DE 10] by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. (DeFalco, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 5/14/2020 (DG).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/13/2020. (GSO)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Central Market of FL II, Inc. of Service of TRO. (Tilden, Jesse) Modified on 5/13/2020 (DG).
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of service by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. re #13 Summons returned executed, 10 Order on Ex Parte Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #11 Summons returned executed, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 Summons returned executed, #14 Summons returned executed . (DeFalco, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 05/08/2020 by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. as to Joseph Pavkovich. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 05/08/2020 by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. as to Marsha Forrest. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 05/08/2020 by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. as to Nathan Forrest. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 05/08/2020 by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. as to Central Market of FL II, Inc. (DeFalco, Steven) Modified on 5/11/2020 (DG).
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Spring Valley Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(DeFalco, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Central Market of FL II, Inc., Marsha Forrest, Nathan Forrest, Joseph Pavkovich. (TDC)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-994-T-23SPF. (SJB)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. Related case(s): No (DeFalco, Steven) Modified on 4/30/2020 (TDC).
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Spring Valley Produce, Inc. (DeFalco, Steven) Modified on 4/30/2020 (TDC).
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16758971) filed by Spring Valley Produce, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Central Market of FL II, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons - Marsha Forrest, #4 Proposed Summons - Nathan Forrest, #5 Proposed Summons - Joseph Pavkovich)(DeFalco, Steven) Modified on 4/30/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spring Valley Produce, Inc. v. Central Market of FL II, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Forrest
Represented By: Jesse Michael Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pavkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Market of FL II, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Michael Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Forrest
Represented By: Jesse Michael Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spring Valley Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?