Byerley v. NVR, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donna Byerley
Defendant: NVR, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01137
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by NVR, Inc. (Kantaskas, J.) Modified on 6/16/2020 (DG).
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of lis pendens by Donna Byerley (Fulmer, Paul) COUNSEL TO REFILE ITEM USING CORRECT DOCKETING CODE [NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF RELATED CASES]. Modified on 6/2/2020 (DG).
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Donna Byerley. (Fulmer, Paul)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by NVR, Inc. (Kantaskas, J.) Modified on 6/2/2020 (DG).
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by NVR, Inc. (Mirghahari, Ali) Modified on 6/2/2020 (DG).
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by NVR, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Mirghahari, Ali) Modified on 6/2/2020 (DG).
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by NVR, Inc. (Mirghahari, Ali) Modified on 6/2/2020 (DG).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint #6. The deadline for Defendant's response to the Complaint is extended to June 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/26/2020. (LJB)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal and Complaint by All Defendants. (Mirghahari, Ali) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donna Byerley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Fulmer, Paul)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/18/2020. (BGS)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/18/2020. (BGS)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1137-T-36SPF. (SJB)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL At the Sixth Judicial Circuit, in and for Pasco County, FL, case number 2020-CA-000953 filed in State Court on 4/16/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16817997 filed by NVR, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C - State Court Papers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit B - Donna Byerley Public Records)(Mirghahari, Ali) Modified on 5/18/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byerley v. NVR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVR, Inc.
Represented By: Ali Vakili Mirghahari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Byerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?