Reyes v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Plaintiff: Silvia Reyes
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01146
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #17 Answer to amended complaint PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Silvia Reyes. (Kleinberg, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #12 Amended Complaint by Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC. (Samuel, Sherilee) Modified on 7/1/2020 (DG).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2021, Pretrial statement due by 6/22/2021, All other motions due by 6/29/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 8/2/2021 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/31/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/30/2020. (BGS)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 ***TERMINATED-DISCOVERY***APPENDIX PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL RULE 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURES by Silvia Reyes. (Kleinberg, Bruce) Modified on 6/23/2020 (CTR). (CTR).
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Samuel, Sherilee)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Samuel, Sherilee)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Kleinberg, Bruce)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties with Jury Demand. filed by Silvia Reyes.(Kleinberg, Bruce)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Walsh, Nicole)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may appear by telephone at the case management conference for the purpose of filing their joint Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 6/15/2020. (MLM)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Sherilee J. Samuel to appear telephonically for Case Management Conference by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Samuel, Sherilee) Modified on 6/15/2020 (DG).
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order for civil cases by Silvia Reyes. (Kleinberg, Bruce)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases 20-CA-3491 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Silvia Reyes. Related case(s): yes (Kleinberg, Bruce)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/9/2020. (BGS)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/9/2020. (BGS)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) Modified on 5/19/2020 (AG).
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1146-T-36AAS. (SJB)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Thirteenth Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, FL, case number 2020-CA-3491 filed in State Court on 4/17/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16821985 filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint)(Samuel, Sherilee) Modified on 5/19/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Sherilee J. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Reyes
Represented By: Bruce Moshe Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?