Hornbeck et al v. Lovejoy
Plaintiff: CHASE HORNBECK, JANET L LABELLE and Janet L. Labelle
Defendant: JAMES J LOVEJOY and James J. Lovejoy
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2020cv01154
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for January 14, 2021, at 1:30 PM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/24/2020. (DMD)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 14, 2021 at 1:30 pm before Peter J. Grilli. (Lao, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James J. Lovejoy. (Mazuchowski, Susan)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/2/2020. (SKP)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. # 9), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/2/2020. (SKP)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the June 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/25/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/2/2020. (SKP)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mazuchowski, Susan)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: While the Court appreciates the timely filing of the Case Management Report (Doc. #6), there are multiple problems with the Case Management Report. First, despite the Court's previous warning that "the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges" and that the proper form "can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website" (Doc. # 3), the parties have not used the undersigned's Case Management Report form. Additionally, the Court previously advised the parties that, if they "believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned." (Id.). Yet, the parties' Case Management Report proposes a discovery deadline of April 2, 2021--10 months from now--and does not include a detailed explanation for why such a long discovery period is necessary or a timeline for the planned discovery. In light of these deficiencies, the Court rejects the Case Management Report. The parties are directed to complete and file the proper Case Management Report form--found under the "Forms" tab of the undersigned's page of the Court's website--by June 5, 2020. If the parties propose over 8 months for discovery, they must provide the required detailed explanation and timeline. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2020. (DMD)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mazuchowski, Susan)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chase Hornbeck, Janet L. Labelle. Related case(s): No (Lowman, Brent)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/19/2020. (SKP)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by June 2, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/19/2020. (DMD)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1154-T-33AEP. (SJB)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL At the Sixth Judicial Circuit, in and for Pasco County, FL, case number 2020-CA-743 filed in State Court on 3/16/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16823458 filed by James J. Lovejoy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court ANSWER, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mazuchowski, Susan) Modified on 5/19/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornbeck et al v. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE HORNBECK
Represented By: Matthew M. Donaldson
Represented By: Brent M. Lowman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET L LABELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Labelle
Represented By: Matthew M. Donaldson
Represented By: Brent M. Lowman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES J LOVEJOY
Represented By: Susan Kim Mazuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Lovejoy
Represented By: Susan Kim Mazuchowski
Represented By: Anthony J. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?