Essilor International et al v. JDP Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dac Vision Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Essilor International, Satisloh AG and Satisloh North America, Inc.
Defendant: Q Pacific Manufacturing Corp., JDP Holdings, LLC, Gladwin Optical, Gladwin M & E Tech. CO., LTD., Yangzhou Gladwin M & E Tech. CO., LTD. and Yangzhou Perfect Machinery Tech. Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01159
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of compliance re 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dac Vision Inc., Essilor International, Essilor of America, Inc., Satisloh AG, Satisloh North America, Inc. (Davis, Amber)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/29/2020. (GSO)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Philippe J.C. Signore, Tia D. Fenton, Jeffrey B. McIntyre, and Lisa M. Mandrusiak may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Attorney Amber N. Davis designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/26/2020. (JMF)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q) (TDC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 Verified MOTION for Lisa M. Mandrusiak to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16845649 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 Verified MOTION for Jeffrey B. McIntyre to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16845621 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Verified MOTION for Tia D. Fenton to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16845588 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 Verified MOTION for Philippe J.C. Signore to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16845431 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 22, 2020 Sealed Document S11. (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/21/2020. (JMF)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dac Vision Inc., Essilor International, Essilor of America, Inc., Satisloh AG, Satisloh North America, Inc. re 4 Notice to counsel of Local Rule Civil Cover Sheet (Davis, Amber)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Tia D. Fenton of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Philippe J.C. Signore of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Lisa M. Mandrusiak of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Jeffrey B. McIntyre of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Amber N. Davis of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1159-T-23AEP. (SJB)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Redacted Complaint and Confidential Material Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Amber)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16826773) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Davis, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essilor International et al v. JDP Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dac Vision Inc.
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essilor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essilor International
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satisloh AG
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satisloh North America, Inc.
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Pacific Manufacturing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDP Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladwin Optical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladwin M & E Tech. CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yangzhou Gladwin M & E Tech. CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yangzhou Perfect Machinery Tech. Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?