Dottin v. Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Sophia Dottin
Defendant: Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, Maria Blanchard and Cognizant Business Services Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv01172
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED: This cause is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause shown. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/2/2020. (CSS)
July 2, 2020 Filing 27 MEDIATION report Hearing held on June 24, 2020. Hearing outcome: Settled. (Munoz, Shane) Modified on 7/2/2020 (DG).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED: The Order to Show Cause #20 is discharged. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/19/2020. (CSS)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Defendant Cognizant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Pending Private Mediation. Defendant's answer or response is due on or before 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 6/12/2020. (AHA)
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint (6-9-2020) Pending Private Mediation by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
June 3, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #20 Order pdf filed by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 29, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED: Defendant Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this action should not be remanded to the Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida for lack of diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(1). Defendant shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order within the time provided will result in this action being remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/26/2020. (CSS)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED: (1) The Joint Motion for Substitution of Defendant Cognizant #14 is hereby GRANTED. (2) Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation is hereby substituted for and in place of Defendant Cognizant Business Services Corporation. The Clerk is directed to amend the case caption to reflect the substitution. (3) Defendant Cognizant Business Services Corporation is dismissed from this action, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/22/2020. (CSS)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion to Conduct the Case Management Conference between Plaintiff and Defendant Cognizant Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/22/2020. (AHA)
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Kathryn Hopkinson and Matthew Russell to appear telephonically for the Case Management Conference by Sophia Dottin. (Hopkinson, Kathryn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sophia Dottin. Related case(s): yes (Hopkinson, Kathryn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Sophia Dottin. (Hopkinson, Kathryn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Cognizant by Sophia Dottin. (Hopkinson, Kathryn)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendant Cognizant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response is due on or before 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/21/2020. (AHA)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sari M. Alamuddin; granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anna K. Perocchi; granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew A. Russell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/21/2020. (AHA)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew A. Russell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836354 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Anna K. Perocchi to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836331 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Sari M. Alamuddin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836297 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Sari M. Alamuddin of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Matthew A. Russell of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Anna K. Perocchi of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/21/2020. (BGS)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/21/2020. (BGS)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1172-T-36CPT. (SJB)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillborough County, Florida, case number 20-CA-003458 filed in State Court on 04/20/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16833530 filed by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit 1A, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Modified on 5/21/2020 (TDC). Modified on 5/21/2020 (AG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dottin v. Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Dottin
Represented By: Kathryn Comly Hopkinson
Represented By: James Moten Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Ray Espino Reynolds
Represented By: Matthew A. Russell
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Anna K. Perocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Ray Espino Reynolds
Represented By: Matthew A. Russell
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Anna K. Perocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?