Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al v. One World Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shelly Repinski and Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01240
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Hillary High as mediator by Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Carlson, Robert)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2021, Pretrial statement due by 11/16/2021, All other motions due by 11/23/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/3/2022 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/25/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/30/2020. (BGS)
June 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Carlson, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Branton, Christopher)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Carlson, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Anthony Carlson on behalf of Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Carlson, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.; Corporate Parent Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. for One World Technologies, Inc. (Branton, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG).
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. Related case(s): No. (Branton, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG).
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by One World Technologies, Inc.(Branton, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG).
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(Branton, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/1/2020. (BGS)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/1/2020. (BGS)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1240-T-36AEP. (SJB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL JOINT from Pinellas County, case number 2020-CA-1830 filed in State Court on 04-10-20. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16861308) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Branton, Christopher) Modified on 5/29/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al v. One World Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Repinski
Represented By: Priscila Bandeira
Represented By: Robert Anthony Carlson
Represented By: Priscila Bandeira Lessa de Assis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Priscila Bandeira
Represented By: Robert Anthony Carlson
Represented By: Priscila Bandeira Lessa de Assis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Branton
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Represented By: Nicole D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Branton
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Represented By: Nicole D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?