Mattson et al v. WTS International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seth Musselman, Austyn Mattson, Daniel Rivera and Jason Rando
Defendant: WTS International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01245
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 39 STATUS report Defendant's Status Report Regarding Arbitration by WTS International, Inc.. (Ayvazian, Emily)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED: The parties shall advise the Court within SEVEN (7) DAYS of the date of this Order as to the status of the arbitration. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/26/2021. (JDE)
March 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration #16 is GRANTED. The parties shall submit all claims asserted in the Amended Complaint to arbitration in accordance with the Arbitration Agreement. This action is STAYED pending arbitration of Plaintiffs' claims. The parties shall file a notice informing the Court that the arbitration has concluded, or that their dispute has otherwise been resolved, within fourteen (14) days of either of such event. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and administratively CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/20/2021. (JDE)
February 2, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change in Local Rules. (BGS)
January 31, 2021 Filing 35 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 01/29/2021. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Daisley, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #30 Affidavit filed by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Pollard, Jonathan)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a response of no more than seven (7) pages on or before December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/14/2020. (CEH)
December 14, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Response to Document #30 (Affidavit of Marco Chavez in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration) by All Plaintiffs. (Prater, Christopher)
December 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 29, 2021 beginning at 1:30 p.m. before Robert Daisley, Esq.. (Prater, Christopher)
November 30, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Marco Chavez re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WTS International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Prather, Laura)
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Chalela Ayvazian on behalf of WTS International, Inc. (Ayvazian, Emily)
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: MOTION HEARING held on 11/16/2020 re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by WTS International, Inc. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (BGS)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2021, Pretrial statement due by 11/16/2021, All other motions due by 11/23/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 3:45 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/3/2022 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/31/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/12/2020. (BGS)
October 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2020 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. The hearing scheduled for NOVEMBER 16, 2020 will be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. The Clerk will be sending everyone an invitation to the meeting via email. If you have any questions, please contact courtroom deputy, Bettye Samuel, at Bettye_Samuel@flmd.uscourts.gov. Although the hearing is taking place by video, all parties should dress appropriately for this Court proceeding. Furthermore, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 4.11(b) the taking of photographs, the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited.(BGS)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED: Upon review of Plaintiffs' Response and the Amended Complaint, the Court concludes that jurisdiction has been adequately alleged. Accordingly, the Court will take no further action on the Order to Show Cause #7 and it is discharged. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/27/2020. (JDE)
September 25, 2020 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Prater, Christopher)
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by WTS International, Inc. Related case(s): n (Prather, Laura) Modified on 9/25/2020 (DG).
September 24, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by WTS International, Inc. (Prather, Laura) Modified on 9/25/2020 (DG).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion. The parties may conduct their case management conference via video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/11/2020. (JMF)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Permit Case Management Report Conference to be Conducted Via Video Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Prater, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. Related case(s): no (Prater, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Declarations)(Pollard, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order, 15 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Prater, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WTS International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prather, Laura) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified on 7/28/2020 (DG).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Document out of time. Plaintiffs shall file their Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/27/2020.(JDE)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document : Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Out of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Prater, Christopher)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera re #12 Amended Complaint Certificate of Service (Pollard, Jonathan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WTS International, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Offer Letter & Proposed Non-Compete Agreement)(Pollard, Jonathan)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within 7 days from the date of this Order. Defendant shall have 14 days to respond to the amended complaint. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/6/2020. (JDE)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order pdf filed by Austyn Mattson, Seth Musselman, Jason Rando, Daniel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pollard Declaration)(Pollard, Jonathan)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. WTS International, Inc. answer or response due on or before 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/26/2020. (JMF)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by WTS International, Inc.. (Prather, Laura) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified event type on 6/23/2020 (CTR).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Plaintiffs are directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why the Complaint #1 should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint, which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order within the time provided will result in this action being dismissed. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/18/2020. (LJB)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 06/02/2020 by Daniel Rivera, Austyn Mattson, Jason Rando, Seth Musselman as to All Defendants. (Pollard, Jonathan)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to WTS International, Inc. (TDC)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/1/2020. (BGS)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/1/2020. (BGS)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1245-T-36AEP. (SJB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16863842) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter & Proposed Non-Compete Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Pollard, Jonathan) Modified on 6/1/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattson et al v. WTS International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Musselman
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austyn Mattson
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rivera
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Rando
Represented By: Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Represented By: Christopher S Prater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTS International, Inc.
Represented By: Laura E. Prather
Represented By: Emily Chalela Ayvazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?