Risdon v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Risdon
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01445
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bank of America, N.A., this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/21/2020. (CCB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bank of America, N.A. (Parrino, Marc)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 60-DAY ORDER dismissing case in accord with attached order. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/8/2020. (CCB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of settlement by Bank of America, N.A. (Parrino, Marc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.(Parrino, Marc)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Response due by 7/16/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/2/2020. (CCB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Bank of America, N.A. (Parrino, Marc)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/25/2020. (SAO)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-1445-T-02JSS. (SJB)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County Court, case number 20-CC-33809 filed in State Court on June 5, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16978336 filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parrino, Marc) Modified on 6/25/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risdon v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Risdon
Represented By: Gordon Tyler Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?