Small Business Administration v. Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
Appellee: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
In Re: PM Radiology, LLC and Gateway Radiology Consultants P.A.
Appellant: Small Business Administration and USF Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 8:2020cv01492
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by USF Federal Credit Union Appellant's Motion to Transfer and Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murray, Megan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:20-cv-1492-T-60. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the Honorable Judge Thomas P. Barber, with his Honor's consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/13/2020. (APF)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY ORDER on appeal received consisting of: CERTIFICATION OF DIRECT APPEAL TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE 11th CIRCUIT. (JNB)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Small Business Administration. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-4971-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 6/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Order)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small Business Administration v. Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PM Radiology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gateway Radiology Consultants P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Ruth A. Harvey
Represented By: Joseph H Hunt
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: USF Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?