U.S. Water Services Corporation v. Stone
Plaintiff: U.S. Water Services Corporation
Defendant: BRANDON STONE
Case Number: 8:2020cv01549
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the joint notice of stipulation of voluntary dismissal with prejudice (Doc. #20), this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to cover its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/31/2020. (DMD)
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Notice with Prejudice) by U.S. Water Services Corporation. (Morales, Suhaill)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the Notice of Settlement (Doc. #18), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. Furthermore, the Court advises the parties that "good cause" exists to reopen an action when a settlement agreement has yet to be finalized because of various delays. But incomplete performance of an executed settlement agreement, such as the failure to disburse settlement funds, does not constitute good cause to reopen an action. This Court does not retain jurisdiction to ensure performance of a settlement agreement because such failure to perform should be addressed in a separate breach of contract action. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/24/2020. (DMD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of settlement by U.S. Water Services Corporation (Morales, Suhaill)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by U.S. Water Services Corporation re #14 Order Setting Hearing of Filing Federal Express Tracking Information. (Morales, Suhaill)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by U.S. Water Services Corporation re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction of Filing Proposed Order for its Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morales, Suhaill)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brandon Stone. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction for 8/27/2020 at 1:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/6/2020. (DK)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/6/2020. (DIGITAL) (EJC)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting telephonic status conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/28/2020. (CKR)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by U.S. Water Services Corporation. Related case(s): No (Morales, Suhaill)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 7/20/2020 by U.S. Water Services Corporation as to Brandon Stone. (LNR)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by August 24, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/27/2020. (DMD)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service by U.S. Water Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit )(Morales, Suhaill)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/13/2020. (TWL)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/13/2020. (TWL)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING MOTION: To the extent the motion seeks a preliminary injunction, the motion for preliminary and permanent injunction (Doc. #3) is hereby referred to the Honorable Sean P. Flynn, United States Magistrate Judge, for the issuance of a report and recommendation, including any hearings, motions, and deadlines related thereto. The motion is not referred to the extent it seeks a permanent injunction. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/10/2020. (DMD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Brandon Stone. (CRH)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Permanent Injunction by U.S. Water Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint)(Morales, Suhaill)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1549-T-33SPF. (SJB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DAMAGES against BRANDON STONE (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17032539) filed by U.S. Water Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - License Detail for Brandon Stone, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Operations and Maintenance Agreement and First Amendment, #4 Exhibit D - Facebook Page, #5 Exhibit E - Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Morales, Suhaill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Water Services Corporation v. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Water Services Corporation
Represented By: Suhaill Machado Morales
Represented By: Robert L. Norton
Represented By: Steven Douglas Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?