Progressive American Insurance Company v. Crilley et al
Plaintiff: Progressive American Insurance Company
Defendant: 319 North Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Crilley, Alexander Barberan, Corey A. Feldman, Adela Ulloa Alvarez and Jennifer Tovar Gonzalez
Case Number: 8:2020cv01640
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Vernon Potter on behalf of 319 North Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Crilley (Potter, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Progressive American Insurance Company. Related case(s): YES (Freeman, Stuart)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Progressive American Insurance Company. (Freeman, Stuart)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 319 North Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Crilley.(Hale, Marion)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by 319 North Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Crilley. (Hale, Marion)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by 319 North Holdings, LLC, Jeffrey Crilley. Related case(s): Yes (Hale, Marion)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Adela Ulloa Alvarez. (Thompson, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Adela Ulloa Alvarez. Related case(s): yes (Thompson, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Adela Ulloa Alvarez.(Thompson, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alexander Barberan, Jennifer Tovar Gonzalez.(Murry, Brian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 07/28/2020 by Progressive American Insurance Company as to Alexander Barberan. (Freeman, Stuart)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 07/28/2020 by Progressive American Insurance Company as to Jennifer Tovar Gonzalez. (Freeman, Stuart)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 07/29/2020 by Progressive American Insurance Company as to Corey A. Feldman. (Freeman, Stuart)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 07/24/2020 by Progressive American Insurance Company as to Adela Ulloa Alvarez. (Freeman, Stuart)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 08/04/2020 by Progressive American Insurance Company as to Jeffrey Crilley. (Freeman, Stuart)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 08/04/2020 by Progressive American Insurance Company as to 319 North Holdings, LLC. (Freeman, Stuart)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2020. (SRC) Modified on 7/31/2020 to attach correct document. (SRC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to 319 North Holdings, LLC, Adela Ulloa Alvarez, Alexander Barberan, Jeffrey Crilley, Corey A. Feldman, Jennifer Tovar Gonzalez. (CRH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1640-T-60AAS. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive American Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17069930) filed by Progressive American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive American Insurance Company v. Crilley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive American Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart J. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 319 North Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert Vernon Potter
Represented By: Marion Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Crilley
Represented By: Robert Vernon Potter
Represented By: Marion Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Barberan
Represented By: Brian David Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey A. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adela Ulloa Alvarez
Represented By: James Beckett Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Tovar Gonzalez
Represented By: Brian David Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?