Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc et al v Goodloe Marine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. and B.C. Towing, Inc.
Defendant: B.C. Towing, Inc and Goodloe Marine, Inc.
Petitioner: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc
Case Number: 8:2020cv01641
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: William F Jung
2 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 ALL FUTURE DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED IN CASE 8:20-cv-679-T-60AAS (MCB)
September 3, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 8:20-cv-00679-TPB-AAS. (MCB)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Reconsideration / Clarification in Case No. 8:20-cv-679. The Court hereby consolidates Case No. 8:20-cv-1641 (the "LOLA") with instant case (the "Goodloe action"). The consolidated cases shall remain designated as Track Two cases and all parties must comply with the requirements established in Local Rule 3.05 for Track Two cases. Goodloe shall file its answer to CIT's counterclaim no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/2/2020. (MCB)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/18/2020. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (SRC)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by B.C. Towing, Inc, Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by B.C. Towing, Inc, Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:20-cv-1641-T-60AAS. Judge William F. Jung no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER transferring case to the Honorable Thomas P. Barber, with his knowledge and consent. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/5/2020. (CCB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc Civil Cover Sheet (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MONITION re 11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (LNR)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Limitation Injunction and Monition. The Clerk is directed to issue the Limitation Injunction and Monition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 7/22/2020. (BEE)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Limitation Injunction and Monition by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Entry of Order Approving Petitioner's Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, and Directing Issuance of Limitation Injunction and Monition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 7/20/2020. (BEE)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul J. Chacon, Jr. on behalf of B.C. Towing, Inc, Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. (Chacon, Raul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Gustavo Adolfo Martinez-Tristani of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/20/2020. (SAO)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc re #4 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Entry of Order Approving Petitioner's Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, and Directing Issuance of Limitation Injunction and Monition. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Entry of Order Approving Petitioner's Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, and Directing Issuance of Limitation Injunction and Monition by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1641-T-02AAS. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goodloe Marine, Inc. (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-17070166) filed by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo) Modified on 7/17/2020 to correct docket text (SJB). Modified on 7/20/2020 (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc et al v Goodloe Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.C. Towing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodloe Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Martinez-Tristani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Martinez-Tristani
Represented By: Raul J. Chacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.C. Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Martinez-Tristani
Represented By: Raul J. Chacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?