Serrano v. Cameron Alf Corp. et al
Plaintiff: MARIA M. SERRANO
Defendant: NERY A. RODRIGUEZ, CAMERON ALF CORP, ALEXIS ARTEAGA and Cameron Alf Corp.
Not Classified By Court: Mark A. Hanley
Case Number: 8:2020cv01642
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER appointing Mark Hanley as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for October 15, 2020, at 9:00 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/11/2020. (DMD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 10/15/2020 at 9 am before Mark A. Hanley, Esq.(Palma, Zandro)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: On August 19, 2020, the Court entered its Scheduling Order, directing Plaintiff to file a notice of mediation by September 3, 2020. (Doc. #12). A review of the docket reveals that no notice has been filed. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file a notice of mediation, indicating the date, time, and location of the mediation conference, by September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/4/2020. (DMD)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Mark A. Hanley, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than October 19, 2020. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by September 3, 2020. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/19/2020. (TWL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alexis Arteaga, Cameron Alf Corp., Nery A. Rodriguez.(Neilsen, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 7/30/2020 by Maria M. Serrano as to Nery A. Rodriguez. (Palma, Zandro)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 7/30/2020 by Maria M. Serrano as to Cameron Alf Corp. (Palma, Zandro)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 7/30/2020 by Maria M. Serrano as to Alexis Arteaga. (Palma, Zandro)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on her efforts to perfect service of process on Defendants by August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/17/2020. (DMD)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria M. Serrano. Related case(s): no (Palma, Zandro)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/28/2020. (TWL)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/28/2020. (TWL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Alexis Arteaga, Cameron Alf Corp., Nery A. Rodriguez. (CRH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1642-T-33AEP. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexis Arteaga, Cameron Alf Corp., Nery A. Rodriguez with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400 receipt number 113A-17070297) filed by Maria M. Serrano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Palma, Zandro) Modified on 7/20/2020 (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano v. Cameron Alf Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA M. SERRANO
Represented By: Zandro E. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NERY A. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric William Neilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON ALF CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXIS ARTEAGA
Represented By: Eric William Neilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Alf Corp.
Represented By: Eric William Neilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mark A. Hanley
Represented By: Mark A. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?