IPS Avon Park Corporation et al v. Kinder Morgan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IPS Avon Park Corporation and D E Jones Consulting, Inc.
Defendant: Mesquite Investors, L.L.C., Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C., El Paso LLC and Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01643
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hale, Marion)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by El Paso LLC, Kinder Morgan, Inc., Mesquite Investors, L.L.C., Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C. identifying Other Affiliate Mesquite Investors, L.L.C. for Mesquite Investors, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Kinder Morgan, Inc.; Other Affiliate El Paso LLC, Other Affiliate El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., L.L.C., Other Affiliate El Paso Merchange North America Company, L.L.C. for El Paso LLC; Corporate Parent Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C., Other Affiliate General Electric Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Global Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate EFS Shady Hills, LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, Inc., Other Affiliate EFS Shady Hills Power Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate EFS Shady Hills Holdco I, Inc., Other Affiliate EFS Shady Hills Power Holdco II, Inc. for Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C... (Cuva, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by El Paso LLC, Kinder Morgan, Inc., Mesquite Investors, L.L.C., Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C.. Related case(s): yes (Cuva, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by D E Jones Consulting, Inc., IPS Avon Park Corporation. (Hale, Marion)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by D E Jones Consulting, Inc., IPS Avon Park Corporation. Related case(s): No (Hale, Marion)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: The Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Meeting of Counsel and Filing of Joint Case Management Report (Doc #12) is granted. The parties' deadline to conduct the meeting of counsel is extended to and including August 31, 2020. The meeting of counsel may be conducted telephonically or by Zoom or other online platform. The deadline to file the Case Management Report is extended to and including September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/18/2020. (EKB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Report and to Extend Deadline for Meeting of Counsel by Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C.. (Zehnder, Thomas)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #10 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Edwin Bryan Nichols. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/12/2020. (MJP)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Edwin Bryan Nichols to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17170967 for $150 by D E Jones Consulting, Inc., IPS Avon Park Corporation. (Hale, Marion) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (SRC)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by El Paso LLC, Kinder Morgan, Inc., Mesquite Investors, L.L.C., Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C..(Cuva, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Zehnder on behalf of Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C. (Zehnder, Thomas)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marion Hale on behalf of D E Jones Consulting, Inc., IPS Avon Park Corporation (Hale, Marion)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint" (Doc. #3) is hereby granted. Defendants may file their response to the complaint on or before August 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/20/2020. (EKB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet Filing by El Paso LLC, Kinder Morgan, Inc., Mesquite Investors, L.L.C., Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal (Cuva, Anthony) Modified on 7/20/2020 (CRH).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by All Defendants. (Cuva, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1643-T-60CPT. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinellas County Circuit Court, case number 20-002922-CI filed in State Court on June 18, 2020. Filing Fee $400, receipt number 113A-17070445 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents)(Cuva, Anthony) Modified on 7/20/2020 (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPS Avon Park Corporation et al v. Kinder Morgan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesquite Investors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Anthony J. Cuva
Represented By: David A. Hayes
Represented By: James Cullen Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shady Hills Power Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Anthony J. Cuva
Represented By: Thomas A. Zehnder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Cuva
Represented By: David A. Hayes
Represented By: James Cullen Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Cuva
Represented By: David A. Hayes
Represented By: James Cullen Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPS Avon Park Corporation
Represented By: Sharon E. Krick
Represented By: Marion Hale
Represented By: Edwin Bryan Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D E Jones Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon E. Krick
Represented By: Marion Hale
Represented By: Edwin Bryan Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?