Williams et al v. 3rd Home Limited et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan Williams and Anthony Arona
Defendant: 3rd Home Limited, Wade Shealy and 3rd Home Limited Co.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01647
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to file a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (King, Peter)
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Page, Eric)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue filed by Anthony Arona, Johnathan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Page, Eric)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #15 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Response due by September 4, 2020. Reply due by September 25, 2020, if leave to file a reply is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on August 18, 2020. (BRC)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in support, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue by Anthony Arona, Johnathan Williams. (Page, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in support re #15 Motion to Dismiss Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue filed by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (Jones, Phillip)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of E. Wade Shealy, Jr. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (Jones, Phillip)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Daniel Raidt re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jones, Phillip)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue by All Defendants. (Jones, Phillip)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anthony Arona, Johnathan Williams. Related case(s): no (Page, Eric)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Anthony Arona, Johnathan Williams. (Page, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Regarding #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer or response due by August 13, 2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on July 23, 2020. (BRC)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on July 23, 2020. (BRC)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on July 23, 2020. (BRC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (King, Peter)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Sean C. Wlodarczyk to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17086616 for $150 by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (King, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Phillip Byron Jones to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17086557 for $150 by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (King, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. (King, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by 3rd Home Limited, 3rd Home Limited Co., Wade Shealy. Related case(s): no (King, Peter)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/20/2020. (BGS)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/20/2020. (BGS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-1647-T-36JSS. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, Case Number 20-ca-004328 filed in State Court on 5/21/20. Filing Fee $400, receipt number 113A-17071343 filed by 3rd Home Limited Co., 3rd Home Limited, Wade Shealy. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit - Summons, #3 Exhibit -Summons, #4 Exhibit - Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Docket Sheet)(King, Peter) Modified on 7/20/2020 (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. 3rd Home Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3rd Home Limited
Represented By: Peter B. King
Represented By: Phillip Byron Jones
Represented By: Michael Jude Mariani
Represented By: Sean C. Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Shealy
Represented By: Peter B. King
Represented By: Phillip Byron Jones
Represented By: Michael Jude Mariani
Represented By: Sean C. Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3rd Home Limited Co.
Represented By: Peter B. King
Represented By: Phillip Byron Jones
Represented By: Michael Jude Mariani
Represented By: Sean C. Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Williams
Represented By: Eric E. Page
Represented By: Kasey Feltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Arona
Represented By: Eric E. Page
Represented By: Kasey Feltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?