All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. v. The U.S. Small Business Administration et al
Appellant: All Sorts of Services of America, Inc.
Appellee: Jovita Carranza and The U.S. Small Business Administration
Case Number: 8:2020cv01688
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder. scottgrmr@aol.com (SNG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 31, 2020 before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott N. Gamertsfelder,Telephone number 813.301.5898. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/2/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020. (SNG)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (ANL)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: All Sorts' "Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. [2-21]) is granted. The "United States' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. [2-25]) is denied. The parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed judgement by 5:00 p.m. on Monday August 3, 2020. If, after conferring, they cannot agree on a proposed judgment, each party may submit a separate proposal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Michael G. Williamson Memorandum Opinion)(ANL)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's "Motion to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request for Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020" (Doc. #3) is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2020. (ANL)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: MOTION HEARING held on 7/31/2020 re #3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate filed by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (SRC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of ZOOM hearing on #3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas P. Barber. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom invitation via email. (SRC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. (Cole, Richard) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (MCB).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: #1 2 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #2 3 Response to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #3 4 Public Docket - Adversary Proceeding, #4 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_1_Verified_Complaint_by_All_Sorts_of_Services_of_America_Inc_against_Small_Business_Admini, #5 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #6 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #7 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #8 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000002_Summons_issued_on_Small_Business_Administration_Jovita_Corranza_along_with_Local_Rule_700, #9 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000003_Service_Executed_on_Jovita_Carranza_and_US_Small_Business_Administration_of_Summons_Com, #10 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000004_Emergency_Motion_to_Expedite_Hearing, #11 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000005_Certificate_of_Necessity_for_Emergency_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Emergency_Hearing_on_Complain, #12 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000006_Notice_of_Hearing_Filed_by_Richard_John_Cole_III_on_behalf_of_Plaintiff_All_Sorts_of_Servi, #13 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_1_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Verified_Complaint_for_Declaratory_Judgment_Writ_of_Mandamus_and, #14 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_2_Exhibit_1_-_Miller_Declaration, #15 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_3_Miller_Declaration_Exhibit_A_-_SBA_Form_1919, #16 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_4_Exhibit_2_-_SBA_Form_147, #17 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000009_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Richard_Cole, #18 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000010_Order_Granting_Emergency_Motion_on_Complaint_for_Declaratory_Judgment_Writ_of_Mandamus_an, #19 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000011_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Granting_Emergency_Motion_to_Expedite_Hearing_Filed_by_Richard, #20 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000012_Motion_to_Determine_Whether_Proceeding_Is_Core_Filed_by_Christopher_J_Emden_on_behalf_of_D, #21 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_1_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Hearing_Scheduled_for_July_8_2020_at_930_am_Filed_by_Richa, #22 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #23 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #24 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #25 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_1_Cross_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Debtors_Verified_Complaint_for_Declaratory_Judgment, #26 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_2_Memorandum_In_Support_of_Cross_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment, #27 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_3_Exhibit_1_-_Miller_Declaration, #28 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_4_MIller_Declaration_Exhibit_A_-_SBA_Form_1919, #29 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_5_Exhibit_2_-_SBA_Form_147, #30 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000015_Supplemental_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Filed_by_Christopher_J_Emden_on_behalf_of_Defendan, #31 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000016_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Richard_John_Cole_III_on_beha, #32 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000017_Transmittal_of_Motion_for_Withdrawal_of_Reference_to_District_Court_Case_No_820-cv-0155, #33 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000018_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Richard_Cole, #34 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000019_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #35 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000021_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Case_Law_in_Support_of_Plaintiffs_Position_that_Proceeding_is_Core_Filed, #36 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000021_Part_2_Skefos_v_Carranza_2020_Bankr_LEXIS_1479, #37 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000022_Order_entered_on_July_17_2020_by_District_Court_Judge_Mary_S_Scriven_Re_Appeal_on_Civi, #38 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000023_Transmittal_of_Withdrawal_of_Reference_to_District_Court_Case_No_820-cv-01688-DJ_-_Judg)(JN)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Jovita Carranza, The U.S. Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal, #2 Exhibit Response)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. v. The U.S. Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: All Sorts of Services of America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Cole, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jovita Carranza
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The U.S. Small Business Administration
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?