Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: UNLIMITED FINANCIAL FUNDING, LLC, HOWARD MARKOWITZ PA CPA, UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS and Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. a Florida corporation, individually and on behalf of similarly situated businesses and individuals doing business as Unbehagen Advisors
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., RADIUS BANK, VALLEY NATIONAL BANK, PNC BANK, N.A., CITIZENS BANK, SOUTH STATE BANK, N.A., SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK, TRUIST BANK, TD BANK, N.A., FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., REGIONS BANK, FLAGSHIP BANK, FIRST CITRUS BANK, MIDWEST REGIONAL BANK, STEARNS BANK, N.A., HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK, THE BANK OF TAMPA, USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, TRUSTCO BANK, SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, N.A., The First, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., ADDITION FINANCIAL, PRIME MERIDIAN BANK and CITIZENS FIRST BANK, INC.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01709
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 194 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Popok, Michael)
September 21, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Peter A. Pastore, appearing on behalf of Trustco Bank (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061956.). (JLD)
September 17, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE of compliance re 151 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 152 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PNC Bank, N.A. (Varner, Joseph)
September 16, 2020 Filing 192 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Radius Bank. Related case(s): No (Pegg, Allen)
September 16, 2020 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Radius Bank. (Pegg, Allen)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ENDORSED ORDER granting #185 Defendant Stearns Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Ashley Simonsen Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, she shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/16/2020. (MJP)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ENDORSED ORDER granting #184 Defendant Stearns Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Andrew Soukup Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/16/2020. (MJP)
September 16, 2020 Filing 188 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #147 Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant, First Citrus Bank, to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant First Citrus Bank shall have up to and including October 19, 2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. ALL DEFENDANTS have been given up to and including October 19, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (See previous Endorsed Order 157) Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/15/2020. (AKJ)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART #150 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Respond Pending a Pretrial Conference to Consolidate Future Motion Practice, or in the Alternative, Motion for an Order Setting a Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Schedule with Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Plaintiffs' deadlines for filing responses to the motions to dismiss shall be extended until the Court decides whether this action should be severed, such that each Defendant is sued separately by any allegedly injured Plaintiff(s). The Complaint fails to provide sufficient allegations to support a conclusion that the claims against the various Defendants are reasonably related or properly joined. Plaintiffs are therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, why the Plaintiffs' claims against the various Defendants should not be severed and Plaintiffs ordered to file separate actions. Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days to reply to Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response. Should the matter be allowed to proceed as pleaded, the Court will hold a Rule 16 conference to coordinate the proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/15/2020. (AKJ)
September 15, 2020 Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION for Ashley Simonsen to appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act by Stearns Bank, N.A.. (Raines, Lauren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 15, 2020 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Soukup to appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act by Stearns Bank, N.A.. (Raines, Lauren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 15, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren G. Raines on behalf of Stearns Bank, N.A. (Raines, Lauren)
September 15, 2020 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Citizens First Bank, Inc.. (Smith, Phillip)
September 15, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by PNC Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): yes (Varner, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Walsh on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Walsh, Sean)
September 15, 2020 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order Certificate of Intrested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bilik, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Robert Eric Bilik on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bilik, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 177 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Trustco Bank. (Jontz, Jeffry)
September 14, 2020 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cla filed by Valley National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of 8-11-2020 hearing in SD Fla.)(Blum, W.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Popok, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Howard Markowitz PA CPA (Popok, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Regions Bank's #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Larry Childs, Esq. Although Plaintiffs originally objected to Defendant's motion, they failed to provide a basis for their objection by September 9, 2020, as directed by the Court. (Doc. 119). If Defendant's counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/14/2020. (MJP)
September 14, 2020 Filing 172 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The First. Related case(s): Yes (Riley, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hancock Whitney Bank. Related case(s): no (Cook, Gregory)
September 14, 2020 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cla filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cook, Gregory)
September 14, 2020 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by South State Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent South State Corporation for South State Bank, N.A... (George, Christian)
September 14, 2020 Filing 168 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by PNC Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank, N.A... (Varner, Joseph)
September 14, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Truist Bank. Related case(s): Yes (Rottmann, Emily)
September 14, 2020 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank.. (Rottmann, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #154 Defendant Radius Bank's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. All Defendants have been given up to and including October 19, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (See previous Endorsed Order 157) Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/11/2020. (AKJ)
September 11, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by South State Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): no (George, Christian)
September 11, 2020 Filing 163 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by USF Federal Credit Union. (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 162 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Fairwinds Credit Union. (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Addition Financial. (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by USF Federal Credit Union. Related case(s): no (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fairwinds Credit Union. Related case(s): no (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Addition Financial. Related case(s): no (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #138 Defendants Additional Financial Credit Union, Fairwinds Credit Union, and USF Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. All Defendants shall have up to and including October 19, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/11/2020. (AKJ)
September 11, 2020 Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cla filed by South State Bank, N.A.. (George, Christian)
September 11, 2020 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cla filed by Regions Bank. (Prueter, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Radius Bank. (Pegg, Allen)
September 10, 2020 Filing 153 RESPONSE to Motion re #150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cla filed by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Drushal, Amy)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant PNC Bank, N.A.'s #145 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeohn Salone Favors, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/10/2020. (MJP)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant PNC Bank, N.A.'s #144 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan M. Moses, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/10/2020. (MJP)
September 10, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. d/b/a Unbehagen Advisors Complaint Pending a Pretrial Conference to Consolidate Future Motion Practice, or in the Alternative, Motion for an Order Setting a Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Schedule by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC. (Popok, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 149 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by TD Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent TD Bank US Holding Company, Other Affiliate The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate TD Group US Holdings LLC for TD Bank, N.A... (LeMieux, George)
September 10, 2020 Filing 148 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by First Citrus Bank. (Buford, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by First Citrus Bank. (Buford, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Buford on behalf of First Citrus Bank (Buford, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Jeohn Salone Favors to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17291870 for $150 by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Special Admission form)(Varner, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 10, 2020 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan M. Moses to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17291810 for $150 by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Special Admission form)(Varner, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 10, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Jay Bornstein on behalf of Addition Financial, Fairwinds Credit Union, USF Federal Credit Union (Bornstein, Brandon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC (Popok, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Torres, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 140 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by South State Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent South State Corporation for South State Bank, N.A... (Miller, Brian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Citizens First Bank, Inc.. (Smith, Phillip)
September 9, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Addition Financial, Fairwinds Credit Union, USF Federal Credit Union. (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 137 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by USF Federal Credit Union. (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 136 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fairwinds Credit Union. (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 135 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Addition Financial. (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Kevin Knight on behalf of Addition Financial, Fairwinds Credit Union, USF Federal Credit Union (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Kevin Knight on behalf of Addition Financial, Fairwinds Credit Union, USF Federal Credit Union (Knight, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Jay Harrington on behalf of South State Bank, N.A. (Harrington, Howard)
September 9, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian P. George on behalf of South State Bank, N.A. (George, Christian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by South State Bank, N.A.. (Miller, Brian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Robert Brand re #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Drushal, Amy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Drushal, Amy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. d/b/a Unbehagen Advisors Complaint by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Johnson)(Hargitai, Peter)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENDORSED ORDER granting #122 Defendant Hancock Whitney Bank's Unopposed Motion for Tyler P. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/8/2020. (MJP)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ENDORSED ORDER granting #121 Defendant Hancock Whitney Bank's Unopposed Motion for Gregory C. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/8/2020. (MJP)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ENDORSED ORDER granting #120 Defendant Hancock Whitney Bank's Unopposed Motion for L. Conrad Anderson, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/8/2020. (MJP)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING all Defendants' Motions for Extensions of Time to Respond to Complaint. #73 #93 #95 #99 #103 #104 #113 All Defendants shall have up to and including October 19, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/4/2020. (AKJ)
September 4, 2020 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Tyler P. Bishop to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17275943 for $150 by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Gregory, Geremy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 4, 2020 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Gregory C. Cook to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17275922 for $150 by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Gregory, Geremy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 4, 2020 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for L. Conrad Anderson, IV to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17275889 for $150 by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Gregory, Geremy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENDORSED ORDER: No later than September 9, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant Regions Bank's #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Larry Childs, Esq. Plaintiffs' response shall set forth the basis for their objection to the motion and shall consist of no more than five (5) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/4/2020. (MJP)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Regions Bank's #111 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Helen Eckinger, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, she shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/4/2020. (MJP)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Regions Bank's #110 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles Prueter, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/4/2020. (MJP)
September 4, 2020 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #113 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Drushal, Amy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Robert Brand re #114 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Drushal, Amy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 114 TERMINATED. MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Drushal, Amy) NOTE: Incorrect case number, counsel notified to re-file. Modified on 9/9/2020 (LD).
September 3, 2020 Filing 113 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (White, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Regions Bank identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Regions Bank.. (Hargitai, Peter)
September 3, 2020 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Helen Eckinger to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17266390 for $150 by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hargitai, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 3, 2020 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Charles Prueter to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17266337 for $150 by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hargitai, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 3, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION for Larry Childs to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17266220 for $150 by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hargitai, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant TD Bank, N.A.'s #97 Renewed Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica R. Ecker, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, she shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/3/2020. (MJP)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant TD Bank, N.A.'s #96 Renewed Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew J. Porpora, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/3/2020. (MJP)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #93 Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant Hancock Whitney Bank to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant Hancock Whitney Bank shall have up to and including October 6, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/2/2020. (AKJ)
September 2, 2020 Filing 105 SUMMONS reissued as to Prime Meridian Bank. (LD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by Truist Bank. (Rottmann, Emily)
September 2, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Midwest Regional Bank. (Toland, Howard)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER granting #90 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Jesse Smallwood Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/2/2020. (MJP)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENDORSED ORDER granting #89 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Craig Singer Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/2/2020. (MJP)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ENDORSED ORDER granting #88 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Kenneth Smurzynski Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/2/2020. (MJP)
September 2, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Directed to the Complaint by Trustco Bank. (Jontz, Jeffry)
September 2, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffry R. Jontz on behalf of Trustco Bank (Jontz, Jeffry)
September 2, 2020 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Jessica R. Ecker to appear pro hac vice by TD Bank, N.A.. (Kaskel, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 2, 2020 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew J. Porpora to appear pro hac vice by TD Bank, N.A.. (Kaskel, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 1, 2020 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Varner, Joseph)
September 1, 2020 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Midwest Regional Bank. (Toland, Howard)
September 1, 2020 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Gregory, Geremy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Hancock Whitney Bank identifying Corporate Parent Hancock Whitney Corporation for Hancock Whitney Bank.. (Gregory, Geremy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Geremy Walden Gregory on behalf of Hancock Whitney Bank (Gregory, Geremy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Jesse Smallwood, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17256366 for $150 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Liebler, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 1, 2020 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Craig Singer, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17256333 for $150 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Liebler, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 1, 2020 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Kenneth Smurzynski, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17256260 for $150 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Liebler, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ENDORSED ORDER granting #80 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Enu Mainigi Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, she shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/1/2020. (MJP)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant TD Bank, N.A.'s #77 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica R. Ecker, Esq. It is unclear from the motion if attorney Ecker is a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States in accordance with Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/1/2020. (MJP)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant TD Bank, N.A.'s #76 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew J. Porpora, Esq. It is unclear from the motion if attorney Porpora is a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States in accordance with Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/1/2020. (MJP)
August 31, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Beard Renstrom on behalf of Regions Bank (Renstrom, Laura)
August 31, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter P. Hargitai on behalf of Regions Bank (Hargitai, Peter)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants Flagship Bank and The Bank of Tampa ONLY. Plaintiffs' claims against the remaining Defendants shall proceed in the normal course. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/31/2020. (GMD)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #73 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have up to and including October 6, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/31/2020. (GMD)
August 31, 2020 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Enu Mainigi, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17248862 for $150 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Liebler, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Valley National Bank's #72 Unopposed Renewed Motion for Special Admission of Clark E. Alpert, Esq. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/31/2020. (MJP)
August 31, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard S. Toland on behalf of Midwest Regional Bank (Toland, Howard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Jessica R. Ecker to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17246037 for $150 by TD Bank, N.A.. (Kaskel, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 31, 2020 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew J. Porpora to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17245887 for $150 by TD Bank, N.A.. (Kaskel, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 28, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by George S. LeMieux on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (LeMieux, George)
August 28, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H Kaskel on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (Kaskel, Jonathan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Liebler, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Clark E. Alpert to appear pro hac vice by Valley National Bank. (Blum, W.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant Valley National Bank's #67 Motion for Special Admission of Clarke E. Alpert, Esq. It is unclear from the motion whether the conferral requirements of Local Rule 3.01(g) have been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/28/2020. (MJP)
August 27, 2020 Filing 70 RETURN of service executed on 08/20/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Stearns Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 69 RETURN of service executed on 08/18/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to USF Federal Credit Union. (Popok, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 68 RETURN of service executed on 08/19/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Seacoast National Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Clark E. Alpert to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17234502 for $150 by Valley National Bank. (Blum, W.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 27, 2020 Filing 66 RETURN of service executed on 08/24/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS, Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to South State Bank, N.A.. (Patricios, Leon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 65 RETURN of service executed on 08/24/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS, Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to First Citrus Bank. (Patricios, Leon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 64 RETURN of service executed on 08/26/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS, Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to The Bank of Tampa. (Patricios, Leon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 63 RETURN of service executed on 8/19/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Citizens First Bank, Inc.. (Popok, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 62 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Valley National Bank identifying Corporate Parent Valley National Bancorp for Valley National Bank.. (Blum, W.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ronald White on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (White, Christopher)
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Picone on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Picone, Joseph)
August 26, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Torres on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Torres, Christopher)
August 26, 2020 Filing 58 RETURN of service executed on 8/12/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Valley National Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 57 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to The First. (Popok, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 56 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to The First. (Popok, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 55 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Hancock Whitney Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 54 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Midwest Regional Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Paul J. Nathanson, appearing on behalf of Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061721.) Related document: #34 MOTION for Paul J. Nathanson to appear pro hac vice . (JLD)
August 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Antonio M. Haynes, appearing on behalf of Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061721.) Related document: #33 MOTION for Antonio M. Haynes to appear pro hac vice . (JLD)
August 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ramsey B. Prather, appearing on behalf of Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061721.) Related document: #27 MOTION for Ramsey B. Prather to appear pro hac vice . (JLD)
August 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney James E. Butler, appearing on behalf of Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061721.) Related document: #26 MOTION for James E. Butler, Jr. to appear pro hac vice . (JLD)
August 26, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Barry Blum on behalf of Valley National Bank (Blum, W.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 51 RETURN of service executed on 8/12/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Bank of America, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 50 RETURN of service executed on 8/19/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Radius Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 49 RETURN of service executed on 8/17/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 48 RETURN of service executed on 8/19/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Trustco Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 47 RETURN of service executed on 8/17/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 46 RETURN of service executed on 8/17/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Truist Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 45 RETURN of service executed on 8/17/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to TD Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on 8/17/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Regions Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 43 RETURN of service executed on 8/18/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Flagship Bank. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 42 RETURN of service executed on 8/20/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Fairwinds Credit Union. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 41 RETURN of service executed on 8/19/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Addition Financial. (Popok, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Synovus Trust Company, N.A.'s #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Non-Resident Counsel for attorney Paul J. Nathanson. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/25/2020. (MJP)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Synovus Trust Company, N.A.'s #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Non-Resident Counsel for attorney Antonio M. Haynes. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/25/2020. (MJP)
August 24, 2020 Filing 38 RETURN of service executed on 8/12/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to PNC Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 37 RETURN of service executed on 8/12/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America, N.A.. Related case(s): no (Liebler, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Liebler, James)
August 24, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Paul J. Nathanson to appear pro hac vice by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Drushal, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 24, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Antonio M. Haynes to appear pro hac vice by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Drushal, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 24, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Seacoast National Bank identifying Corporate Parent Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida for Seacoast National Bank.. (Riley, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by The First identifying Corporate Parent The First Bancshares, Inc. for The First.. (Riley, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Synovus Trust Company, N.A.'s #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Non-Resident Counsel for attorney Ramsey B. Prather. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/24/2020. (MJP)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Synovus Trust Company, N.A.'s #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Non-Resident Counsel for attorney James E. Butler, Jr. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/24/2020. (MJP)
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Prime Meridian Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons originally issued, #2 Exhibit Email showing bad address)(Patricios, Leon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Ramsey B. Prather to appear pro hac vice by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Drushal, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for James E. Butler, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Drushal, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Bates on behalf of Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Bates, Philip)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 PROPOSED summons to be issued by UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC. (Patricios, Leon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Synovus Trust Company, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Synovus Trust Company, N.A. for Synovus Trust Company, N.A... (Drushal, Amy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Liebler, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James Randolph Liebler, II on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Liebler, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/03/2020 by Synovus Trust Company, N.A. as to Synovus Trust Company, N.A.. (Drushal, Amy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lea Drushal on behalf of Synovus Trust Company, N.A. (Drushal, Amy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Allen Riley on behalf of Seacoast National Bank (Riley, Christopher)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Allen Riley on behalf of The First (Riley, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC. (Patricios, Leon)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Patricios, Leon) Modified on 8/14/2020 (AG).
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Howard Markowitz PA CPA. (Patricios, Leon)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Patricios, Leon)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/07/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS, Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Seacoast National Bank. (Patricios, Leon)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/07/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS, Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to The First. (Patricios, Leon)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS of Filing Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Related Case)(Klein, Jason)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on August 6, 2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Stearns Bank, N.A.. (Patricios, Leon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MCB)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/27/2020. (KAC)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/27/2020. (KAC)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC . (Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB).
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Howard Markowitz PA CPA (Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB).
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1709-T-35CPT. (LRB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17096561) filed by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Howard Markowitz PA CPA, and Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comparison Chart 7(a) and PPP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Addition Financial, #4 Proposed Summons Bank of America, #5 Proposed Summons South State, #6 Proposed Summons Chase, #7 Proposed Summons Citizens Bank, #8 Proposed Summons Citizens First, #9 Proposed Summons Fairwinds, #10 Proposed Summons First Citrus, #11 Proposed Summons Flagship, #12 Proposed Summons Hancock Whitney, #13 Proposed Summons Midwest Regional, #14 Proposed Summons PNC, #15 Proposed Summons Prime Meridian, #16 Proposed Summons Radius, #17 Proposed Summons Regions, #18 Proposed Summons Seacoast, #19 Proposed Summons Stearns, #20 Proposed Summons Synovus, #21 Proposed Summons TD, #22 Proposed Summons Bank of Tampa, #23 Proposed Summons The First, #24 Proposed Summons The First 2, #25 Proposed Summons Truist, #26 Proposed Summons Trustco, #27 Proposed Summons USF, #28 Proposed Summons Valley, #29 Proposed Summons WellsFargo)(Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNLIMITED FINANCIAL FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD MARKOWITZ PA CPA
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. a Florida corporation, individually and on behalf of similarly situated businesses and individuals doing business as Unbehagen Advisors
Represented By: Leon N. Patricios
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Eric Bilik
Represented By: Sean Patrick Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADIUS BANK
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Clark E. Alpert
Represented By: W. Barry Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Jeohn Salone Favors
Represented By: Joseph H. Varner, III
Represented By: Jonathan M. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH STATE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Christian P. George
Represented By: Brian P. Miller
Represented By: Howard Jay Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Christopher Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUIST BANK
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica R. Ecker
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora
Represented By: George S. LeMieux
Represented By: Jonathan H Kaskel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Knight
Represented By: Brandon Jay Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Ronald White
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Represented By: Charles W. Prueter
Represented By: Larry B. Childs
Represented By: Peter P. Hargitai
Represented By: Helen Eckinger
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGSHIP BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST CITRUS BANK
Represented By: Charles A. Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST REGIONAL BANK
Represented By: Howard S. Toland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEARNS BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Ashley Simonsen
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Lauren G. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK
Represented By: Gregory C. Cook
Represented By: Tyler P. Bishop
Represented By: Geremy Walden Gregory
Represented By: L. Conrad Anderson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF TAMPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Knight
Represented By: Brandon Jay Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTCO BANK
Represented By: Jeffry R. Jontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, N.A.
Represented By: Antonio M. Haynes
Represented By: Ramsey B. Prather
Represented By: Paul J. Nathanson
Represented By: James E. Butler, Jr.
Represented By: Philip A. Bates
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First
Represented By: Christopher Allen Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Kenneth Smurzynski
Represented By: Jesse Smallwood
Represented By: James Randolph Liebler, II
Represented By: Craig Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDITION FINANCIAL
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Knight
Represented By: Brandon Jay Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME MERIDIAN BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS FIRST BANK, INC.
Represented By: Phillip Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?