Metal Yapi Holdings A.S. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: METAL YAPI HOLDINGS A.S.
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01780
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13--stipulation; dismissing the action; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/22/2020. (BK)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Torres, Christopher)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 and #11--motions for extensions of time; extending through 9/21/2020 the time within which the defendant must respond to the complaint and within which to parties must conduct the case management conference; the case management report is due 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/31/2020. (BK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Order - Case Management Conference & Case Management Report by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Torres, Christopher) Modified on 8/31/2020 (DG).
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Torres, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): NO (Torres, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant's answer or response due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/7/2020. (MLM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal - DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Torres, Christopher) Modified on 8/7/2020 (DG).
August 5, 2020 REFUND for payment. Case 8:20-cv-1779 was deleted. Receipt number 113A-17128848 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Ruby Leal.. (NLC)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/3/2020. (GSO)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Alex Barnett-Howell of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DG)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel John Giardino of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DG)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1780-T-23AAS. (SJB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE THIRTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY, case number 20-CA-005384 filed in State Court on 07/31/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17129075 filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torres, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metal Yapi Holdings A.S. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METAL YAPI HOLDINGS A.S.
Represented By: Inguna Varslavane-Callahan
Represented By: John Giardino
Represented By: Alex Barnett-Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant.
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?