Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Harrell
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: James Harrell, John Doe Entity d/b/a In The Cut BarberShop, Jay Ortiz, Jay Harrell and John Doe Entity doing business as In the Cut Barbershop
Case Number: 8:2020cv01873
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Related case(s): No (Giles, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/19/2020. (CRB)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/19/2020. (CRB)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to James Harrell, John Doe Entity. (CRH)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-1873-T-35JSS. (SJB)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Harrell, John Doe Entity (Filing Fee $400 receipt number 113A-17167248) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity d/b/a In The Cut BarberShop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity doing business as In the Cut Barbershop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?