La Issy, Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: La Issy, Inc. and La Issy Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Jonathan C. Koch
Case Number: 8:2020cv01878
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 12/15/2020 @ 10:00 a.m. before Jonathan C. Koch. (Seibert, Troy)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re mediation; see order for details concerning appearance at mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/30/2020. (GSO)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER appointing Jonathan C. Koch as mediator; designating Troy Seibert as lead counsel; setting 12/31/2020 as the mediation deadline; directing counsel to file a notice within seven days giving the date and time of mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/30/2020. (GSO)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli; jury trial scheduled for the December 2021 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/24/2020. (GSO)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16--Hartford's motion for leave to reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/22/2020. (BK)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Seibert, Troy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Seibert, Troy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by La Issy Inc. (Haynes, Ronald) Modified on 9/16/2020 (DG).
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Seibert, Troy)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Sarah D. Gordon and John J. Kavanagh may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant, with Attorney Troy J. Seibert designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/31/2020. (REE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for John J. Kavanagh and Sarah D. Gordon to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17245678 for $150 by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Seibert, Troy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by La Issy Inc.. (Haynes, Ronald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by La Issy Inc.. Related case(s): no (Haynes, Ronald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Seibert, Troy)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Seibert, Troy)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6--Hartford's motion for an extension of time; extending through 9/1/2020 the time within which Hartford must respond to #1--complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/18/2020. (BK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Seibert, Troy)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/14/2020. (GSO)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Sarah D. Gordon and Caitlin R. Tharp of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1878-T-23AEP. (SJB)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit, case number 20-CA-005460 filed in State Court on 7/13/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17168074 filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit A to State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to State Court Complaint, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #7 Exhibit B - Defendant's Certification of Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit C - Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit D - Experian Powered Business Data Records, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seibert, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Issy, Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy J. Seibert
Represented By: John J. Kavanagh
Represented By: Sarah D. Gordon
Represented By: Caitlin R. Tharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Issy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Issy Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Magazine
Represented By: Ronald Scott Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jonathan C. Koch
Represented By: Jonathan C. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?