United States of America v. Target Recovery Towing Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Target Recovery & Transport Inc. and Target Recovery Towing Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01918
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/29/2020. (EKB)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Agreed Motion to Approve and Enter Consent Order" (Doc. #6) is granted. The Court finds that it has jurisdiction over the parties and subject matter of this case, and that the proposed Consent Order (Doc. [6-1]) is fair and constitutes a reasonable resolution of the case, does not direct or sanction any conduct that is unlawful, unconstitutional, or violative of public policy, and is consistent with the goals and purposes of the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, 50 U.S.C. 3901 et seq. The signed Consent Order will be entered separately. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/29/2020. (EKB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order)(Nick, Tiffany)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): No (Nick, Tiffany)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by United States of America. (Nick, Tiffany)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/21/2020. (SRC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1918-T-60SPF. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Recovery Towing Inc., Target Recovery & Transport Inc. with Jury Demand filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nick, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (AG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Target Recovery Towing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Recovery & Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Recovery Towing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Singer
Represented By: Tiffany Cummins Nick
Represented By: Maria Chapa Lopez
Represented By: William P. Barr
Represented By: Eric S. Dreiband
Represented By: Sameena Shina Majeed
Represented By: Tanya Ilona Kirwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?