Lynn v. USA Tree Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert W. Lynn
Defendant: Christopher T. Richardson, Karen Kettner and USA Tree Service, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01919
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on October 5, 2020 by Robert W. Lynn as to Karen Kettner. (Bouzas, Miguel)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on October 5, 2020 by Robert W. Lynn as to USA Tree Service, LLC. (Bouzas, Miguel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Robert W. Lynn. (Bouzas, Miguel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert W. Lynn. Related case(s): No. (Bouzas, Miguel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Karen Kettner, Christopher T. Richardson, USA Tree Service, LLC. (CRH)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/19/2020. (SAO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-1919-T-02JSS. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17194805) filed by Robert W. Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bouzas, Miguel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. USA Tree Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Lynn
Represented By: Miguel Bouzas
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Kettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Tree Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?