Grant v. Centerstate Bank
Plaintiff: Angela Denise Grant
Defendant: Centerstate Bank
Case Number: 8:2020cv01920
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case Motion to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Centerstate Bank. (George, Christian)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 30, 2020 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/5/2020. (MWC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Angela Denise Grant. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ostrow, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case Motion to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Angela Denise Grant. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Centerstate Bank. (George, Christian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Centerstate Bank. Related case(s): no (George, Christian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Angela Denise Grant. Related case(s): yes (Streisfeld, Jonathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Angela Denise Grant. (Streisfeld, Jonathan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence D. Silverman on behalf of Centerstate Bank (Silverman, Lawrence)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Jay Harrington on behalf of Centerstate Bank (Harrington, Howard)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Centerstate Bank identifying Corporate Parent South State Corporation for Centerstate Bank.. (George, Christian)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/27/2020. (KAC)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/27/2020. (KAC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian P. George on behalf of Centerstate Bank (George, Christian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Centerstate Bank. (CRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Jeffrey D. Kaliel and Sophia Goren Gold of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1920-T-35AAS. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centerstate Bank with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17194979) filed by Angela Denise Grant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Ostrow, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Centerstate Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerstate Bank
Represented By: Lawrence D. Silverman
Represented By: Howard Jay Harrington
Represented By: Christian P. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Denise Grant
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Daniel Edward Tropin
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?