Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jesha Brown o/b/o L.B. and Jesha Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2020cv01922
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 8:20-cv-1922-T-33NPM. Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli no longer assigned to the case. (NAS)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Jesha Brown. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (ARC)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service upon Regional Chief Counsel by Jesha Brown. (ARC)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service upon Attorney General of the United States by Jesha Brown. (ARC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (JLD)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jesha Brown. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2020. (TWL) (TWL).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/19/2020. (REE)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1922-T-33AEP. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Jesha Brown o/b/o L.B.. (Steinberg, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Jesha Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesha Brown o/b/o L.B.
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesha Brown
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?