Boykin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Trent S Boykin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2020cv01925
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service on 10/08/2020 as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel by Trent S Boykin. (CRH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service on 10/08/2020 as to Attorney General of the United States by Trent S Boykin. (CRH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Trent S Boykin. United States Attorney's Office served on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (CRH)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to United States Attorney, Attorney General of the United States, and Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (CRH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Trent S Boykin. Related case(s): No (Escarraz, Enrique)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/25/2020. (MJP)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/20/2020. (SAO)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1925-T-02CPT. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Trent S Boykin. (Escarraz, Enrique)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Trent S Boykin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Appeals Council, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Escarraz, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent S Boykin
Represented By: Enrique Escarraz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?