Ohall v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Klara Ohall
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Petitioner: Dr. Michael T. Margolis
Case Number: 8:2020cv01927
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #62 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Klara Ohall. Related case(s): Yes (Bossier, Sheila)
September 15, 2020 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #62 Related case order and track 2 notice by Klara Ohall. (Bossier, Sheila)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: "Boston Scientific Corporation's Motion for Summary judgment andMemorandum of Law in Support" (Doc. #47) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted to the extent that the Court finds thatDefendant Boston Scientific Corporation is entitled to summary judgmentin its favor, and against Plaintiff, on all claims related to the Repliformdevice. The motion is further granted to the extent that the Court findsthat Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation is entitled to summaryjudgment on Counts III, V, VI, and VIII. The Court will enter a finaljudgment once all claims have been resolved. The motion is otherwise denied. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/14/2020. (ANL)
September 9, 2020 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #62 Related case order and track 2 notice by Boston Scientific Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boston Scientific Corporation for Boston Scientific Corporation.. (McKee, Traci)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Joint Motion for Leave to Meet and Confer Remotely" (Doc. #67) is granted. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/8/2020. (EKB)
September 4, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Boston Scientific Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (McKee, Traci)
September 4, 2020 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Sheila M. Bossier; Joseph Osborne; and Traci T. McKee to appear telephonically or by Videoconference Technology by Klara Ohall. (Bossier, Sheila)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorneys Jon A. Strongman, Michael A. Tanenbaum, Eric M. Anielak, and James H. Keale terminated as to defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/4/2020. (DMS)
September 3, 2020 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Eric Anielak, Jon Strongman, James Keale, and Michael Tanenbaum to Withdraw as Attorney by Boston Scientific Corporation. (McKee, Traci) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 1, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Bell on behalf of Klara Ohall (Bell, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Osborne on behalf of Klara Ohall (Osborne, Joseph)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/1/2020. (SRC)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 plaintiff's Motion for Sheila Bossier to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #60 plaintiff's Motion for McCall M. Chastain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/28/2020. (DMS)
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for MaCall M. Chastain to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17232324 for $150 by Klara Ohall. (Morgan, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 26, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Sheila M. Bossier to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17232231 for $150 by Klara Ohall. (Bossier, Sheila) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 20, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci McKee on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (McKee, Traci)
August 19, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE to counsel Eric M. Anielak, James H. Keale, Jon A. Strongman and Michael A. Tanenbaum of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE to counsel Larissa A. Davis and Sheila M. Bossier of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 55 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of West Virginia. Case assigned to District Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New Case Number: 8:20-cv-1927-T-60TGW. (AG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01028. File received electronically
August 18, 2020 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 7153 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 5 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 8077 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #8 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #9 Exhibit ECF 8142 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 8078 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Green, #14 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX A, #15 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX B, #16 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX C, #17 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX D, #18 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX E, #19 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX F, #20 Exhibit ECF 1010 - WAVE 1 and 2 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Green, #21 Exhibit ECF 1018 - BSC PTO-119 - Order re Pending Daubert Motions Filed in MDL, #22 Exhibit ECF 8139 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Green, #23 Exhibit ECF 8088 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #24 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #25 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #26 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #27 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #28 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #29 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #30 Exhibit ECF 8141 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #31 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #32 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #33 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #34 Exhibit ECF 8074 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Rosenblatt, #35 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #36 Exhibit ECF 8140 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Rosenblatt, #37 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #38 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #39 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #40 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #41 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #42 Exhibit ECF 8076 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Spiegelberg, #43 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #44 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #45 Exhibit ECF 8149 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Spiegelberg, #46 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #47 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #48 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #49 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #50 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #51 Exhibit ECF 8085 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Blaivas, #52 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas, #53 Exhibit ECF 8106 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Blaivas, #54 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #55 Exhibit ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #56 Exhibit ECF 8066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Mays, #57 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #58 Exhibit ECF 8119 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Mays, #59 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #60 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #61 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #62 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #63 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #64 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #65 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #66 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #67 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #68 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #69 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #70 Exhibit ECF 8165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to MTE Mays, #71 Exhibit ECF 5037 - BSC_s Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #72 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #73 Exhibit ECF 8087 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, #74 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #75 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #76 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #77 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #78 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #79 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #80 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #81 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #82 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #83 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #84 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #85 Exhibit ECF 8110 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Margolis, #86 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #87 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #88 Exhibit ECF 8071 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Pence, #89 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #90 Exhibit ECF 8111 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #91 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #92 Exhibit ECF 8166 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #93 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #94 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #95 Exhibit ECF 8084 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #96 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh A, #97 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B1, #98 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B2, #99 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B3, #100 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B4, #101 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh C, #102 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh D, #103 Exhibit ECF 8117 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #104 Exhibit ECF 8164 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #105 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #106 Exhibit ECF 67 - ALLEN - BSC_s Memo in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Green, #107 Exhibit ECF 92 - FOWLER - Exhs A-D, #108 Exhibit ECF 92 - FOWLER - Pltfs Reply in Support of MTE Green, #109 Exhibit ECF 115 - Fowler - Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions), #110 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #111 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #112 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #113 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #114 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying as moot #43 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Klara Ohall to Continue the Deposition Testimony of Ignacio Armas, M.D.; directing that the docket be updated to remove the Movant, Dr. Michael Margolis, from the docket sheet as any motions related to him have been resolved. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying as moot #6 motion by Klara Ohall for additional time to comply with PTO 182. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/15/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE by Klara Ohall in opposition to #47 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Protective Order, #44 Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition and for Protective Order, and #45 Amended Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition and for Protective Order; the subpoena directed to Dr. Margolis is QUASHED and the protective order is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #44 MOTION by Klara Ohall to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D. and MOTION by Klara Ohall for Protective Order, and #45 AMENDED MOTION by Klara Ohall to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D. and AMENDED MOTION by Klara Ohall for Protective Order. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 46 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael T. Margolis on June 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (PDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION by Klara Ohall to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D. and for Protective Order (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION by Dr. Michael T. Margolis to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Michael T. Margolis M.D. and for Protective Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 43 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Klara Ohall to Continue the Deposition Testimony of Ignacio Armas, M.D. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 25, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #41 MOTION by Klara Ohall for Protective Order. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Klara Ohall of Ignacio Armas, M.D. on to be determined at to be determined (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Objections to Defendant's Notice of Deposition of Dr. Michael T. Margolis and Motion for Protective Order by Klara Ohall re: #29 Notice of Deposition of Dr. Michael T. Margolis. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 4/26/2019 to convert event to a motion for protective order) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 40 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Michael T. Margolis, M.D. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ignacio Armas on April 25, 2019 at 5:00 pm. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Janette Barrows on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Linda Hoblitz on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Laurie Ohall on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Heidi Claypool on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Rachel Thomas on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ray Green on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Christopher Walker on April 19, 2019 at 10 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Christopher Walker on April 29, 2019 at 10 am (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael T. Margolis on April 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (PDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 28 OBJECTIONS by Klara Ohall to #25 Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum (Attachment: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ignacio Armas on April 15, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ignacio Armas on April 15, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Klara O'hall on April 2, 2019 at 11:30 AM. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Klara Ohall for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael Hibner on March 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Klara Ohall on April 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Responses to Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Klara Ohall for Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 1/22/2019 to convert event to certificate of service)(rmc) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ignacio Armas, M.D. on March 27, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Klara Ohall for Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Klara Ohall of Hugh Richeson on a date and at a time to be determined but no later than April 29, 2019. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Klara O'Hall on February 12, 2019 at 10;00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael Hibner on January 22, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Christopher Walker, MD on January 22, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ignacio Armas, MD on January 21, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Klara Ohall. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 196 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Klara Ohall for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Klara Ohall for Additional Time to Comply with PTO 182 (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Klara Ohall. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon Strongman on 6/15/2018. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 6/14/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) entered on 06/13/2018 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6557974. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohall v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Traci McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. Michael T. Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klara Ohall
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier
Represented By: Larissa A. Davis
Represented By: James Robert Bell
Represented By: MaCall Morgan Chastain
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?