Freeman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa Freeman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2020cv01932
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lisa Freeman. Related case(s): no (Kelley, Jeanette)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to United States Attorney, Attorney General of the United States, and Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (CRH)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/20/2020. (BGS)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1932-T-36SPF. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201909) filed by Lisa Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons on the Attorney General of the United States, #3 Proposed Summons on the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Proposed Summons for the United States Attorney)(Kelley, Jeanette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Freeman
Represented By: Jeanette A. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?