Munoz De La Cruz v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Raquel Munoz De La Cruz
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 8:2020cv01934
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6--notice; dismissing the action; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/7/2020. (BK)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of settlement by Walmart Stores East, LP (Bolin, Andrew)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Hearn, Trina) ALL PARTIES MUST CONSENT IN ORDER FOR ITEM TO BE FILED. Modified on 9/14/2020 (DG). Modified on 9/14/2020 (DG).
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bolin, Andrew)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/26/2020. (GSO)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-1856-Div B filed in State Court on 2/28/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA061689 filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz De La Cruz v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Andrew S. Bolin
Represented By: Trina Sams Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Munoz De La Cruz
Represented By: Jonah M. Wolfson
Represented By: Johnathan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?