Kirsch Research and Development LLC v. Intertape Polymer Corp
Plaintiff: Kirsch Research and Development LLC
Defendant: Intertape Polymer Corp.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01982
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review, the Defendant's answer in this matter is due September 8, 2020. In addition, counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by September 22, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report for Patent Cases. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report for Patent Cases form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/25/2020. (SGM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Texas. Case assigned to District Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New Case Number: 8:20-cv-1982-T-33JSS. (AG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01029. File received electronically
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER TRANSFERRING TO ANOTHER DISTRICT - Before the Court is Kirsch Plaintiff Research and Development, LLC ("Kirsch") and Defendant Intertape Polymer Corp. ("IPC") (Kirsch and IPC, collectively, the "Parties"), by and through their respective counsel, have stipulated to transfer this case to the Middle District of Florida (Tampa Division). Therefore, the Court hereby ORDERS that this case shall be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division). Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/13/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the Middle District of Florida (Tampa Division) by Kirsch Research and Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wang, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wang, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 25 Appendix in Support filed by Intertape Polymer Corp re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #24 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Tomlinson, Christopher) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Intertape Polymer Corp re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Tomlinson, Christopher) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Intertape Polymer Corp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Tomlinson, Christopher) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Intertape Polymer Corp. Waiver sent on 5/27/2020. (Wang, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for K. Andrew Kent, Jonathan Ma, and Theresa M. Troupson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g) in case 3:20-cv-01024-K; 3:20-cv-01025-K; 3:20-cv-01028-K; 3:20-cv-01029-K; and in case 3:20-cv-01030-K. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/20/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy E. Hayden. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g) in case 3:20-cv-01024-K; 3:20-cv-01025-K; 3:20-cv-01028-K; 3:20-cv-01029-K; and in case 3:20-cv-01030-K. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/20/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Theresa M. Troupson (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10850500) filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jonathan Ma (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10850499) filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney K. Andrew Kent (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10850496) filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Amy E. Hayden (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10850495) filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Intertape Polymer Corp ; served on 4/30/2020. (Wang, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Kirsch Research and Development LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fenster, Marc) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (11) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Wang. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). in case 3:20-cv-01024-K; granting (12) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Wang. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). in case 3:20-cv-01025-K; granting (12) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Wang. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). in case 3:20-cv-01028-K; granting (12) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Wang. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). in case 3:20-cv-01029-K; granting (12) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Wang. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). in case 3:20-cv-01030-K (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/4/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Benjamin T. Wang (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10809343) filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (9) Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel in case 3:20-cv-01024-K; granting (9) Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel in case 3:20-cv-01025-K; granting (10) Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel in case 3:20-cv-01028-K; granting (10) Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel in case 3:20-cv-01029-K; granting (10) Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel in case 3:20-cv-01030-K. The Court may at anytime require Plaintiff to designate local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/29/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Kirsch Research and Development LLC, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/24/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Intertape Polymer Corp. (hml) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (hml) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Apr 24 16:27:48 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kirsch Research and Development LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Intertape Polymer Corp. filed by Kirsch Research and Development LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10792871) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Cover Sheet) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirsch Research and Development LLC v. Intertape Polymer Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intertape Polymer Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsch Research and Development LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: Matthew D Aichele
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Jonathan Ma
Represented By: Theresa M Troupson
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: K Andrew Kent
Represented By: Amy E. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?