CCP SP Hotel, LLC v. Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC
Interested Party: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC:, E2 Capital, LLC and Ally Capital Group, LLC
Appellee: Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC doing business as Hotel Indigo - St. Pete Downtown
Trustee: United States Trustee
Appellant: CCP SP Hotel, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02085
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Anthony, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal to CCP's Moiton for Leave to Appeal Reconsideration Order filed by Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC. (Markham, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/24/2020. (SRC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to counsel Lydia M. Garza of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of interlocutory appeal by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. Bankruptcy Court case number 8-19-bk-9946-CED. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(TDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCP SP Hotel, LLC v. Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC:
Represented By: W. Gregory Golson
Represented By: Leib M. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: E2 Capital, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ally Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Scott Alan Stichter
Represented By: Scott A Poster
Represented By: Charles A. Postler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC doing business as Hotel Indigo - St. Pete Downtown
Represented By: Michael C. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Nicole Peair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CCP SP Hotel, LLC
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: Lydia M. Garza
Represented By: Lydia Marie Gazda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?