Mainer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sandra Mainer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2020cv02124
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (LNR)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sandra Mainer. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/15/2020. (TWL)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on September 11, 2020. (TLM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-2124-T-33JSS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (SJB)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Sandra Mainer. (Steinberg, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Sandra Mainer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Mainer
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?