Geico Indemnity Company v. Pride
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Defendant: Cyrus Bernard, Maribel Rivera, Christyne Pride and Thomas Gordon
Case Number: 8:2020cv02193
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Geico Indemnity Company FILING RETURN OF SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Angley, David)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Geico Indemnity Company FILING RETURN OF SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Angley, David)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 11/5/2020 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment [Doc.1] filed by Christyne Pride. The Court takes the Motion under advisement. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters (SAO)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: In case it is unclear on the docket, the hearing is going forward tomorrow at 9:30 am as originally scheduled. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/4/2020. (Jung, William)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 ***ENTERED IN ERROR (See DE 12)***NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment [Doc.1]. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the # (pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 2193 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 1:00 PM so the hearing may start promptly at 1:30 PM.(CCB) Modified on 11/4/2020 (SAO).
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment [Doc.1] filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Angley, David)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Cyrus Bernard, Maribel Rivera. (BES)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Geico Indemnity Company. (Angley, David)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Geico Indemnity Company. (Angley, David)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the # (pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 2193 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:00 AM so the hearing may start promptly at 9:30 AM.(CCB)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment [Doc.1] by Christyne Pride. (Mulholland, Jason)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Christopher Mulholland on behalf of Christyne Pride (Mulholland, Jason)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 10/07/2020 by Geico Indemnity Company as to Thomas Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Angley, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 10/07/2020 by Geico Indemnity Company as to Thomas Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Angley, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 9/24/2020 by Geico Indemnity Company as to Christyne Pride. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Angley, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for Geico Indemnity Company. (Angley, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Geico Indemnity Company. Related case(s): yes (Angley, David)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/18/2020. (SAO)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Cyrus Bernard, Thomas Gordon, Christyne Pride, Maribel Rivera. (CRH)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2193-T-02AAS. (SJB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17319912 against Christyna Pride as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brittany Strickland, Maribel Rivera, Cyrus Bernard and Thomas Gordon filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Bernard, #6 Proposed Summons Estate, #7 Proposed Summons Gordon, #8 Proposed Summons Rivera)(Angley, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico Indemnity Company v. Pride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maribel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christyne Pride
Represented By: Jason Christopher Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: David Michael Angley
Represented By: B. Richard Young
Represented By: Jordan Marshall Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?