JERMC LTD. et al v. Town of Redington Shores et al
Plaintiff: JERMC LTD. and JERMC Management, Corp.
Defendant: Leland Holmes, Bertram Adams, Jeffery Neal, Town of Redington Shores, Steven Andrews, Thomas Kapper, Joseph Walker, Mary Palmer, James Denhardt, Jeff Neal, Lee Holmes, Bert Adams and Marybeth Henderson
Case Number: 8:2020cv02288
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
2 Judge: Sean P Flynn
3 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 8:20-cv-02215-TPB-AAS. (JNB)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2288-T-60AAS. Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendants' motion to consolidate cases (Doc. #6) is granted. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/23/2020. (ANL)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing of Acceptance of Service by Bertram Adams, Steven Andrews, James Denhardt, Marybeth Henderson, Leland Holmes, Thomas Kapper, Jeffery Neal, Mary Palmer, Town of Redington Shores, Joseph Walker. (Daigneault, Jay) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (MCB).
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of No Objection to Consolidation by JERMC LTD., JERMC Management, Corp. re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer Related Cases and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Beltran, Michael) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (MCB).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendants' Motion to Vacate Order Granting Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases (Dkt. 8) and Corrected Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases and Incorporated Memorandum of Law" (Doc. #9) is denied. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/9/2020. (ANL)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bertram Adams, Steven Andrews, James Denhardt, Marybeth Henderson, Leland Holmes, Thomas Kapper, Jeffery Neal, Mary Palmer, Town of Redington Shores, Joseph Walker Notice of Filing Defendants' Corrected Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Vacate Order Transferring Case and Corrected Motion to Consolidate Case No. 2215)(Daigneault, Jay)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:20-cv-2288-T-60SPF. Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate #8 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases and Corrected Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Defendants. (Daigneault, Jay) . Added MOTION to Consolidate Cases on 10/9/2020 (MCB).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Defendants' unopposed Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases (Doc. #6) is granted only to the extent it seeks transfer to Judge Barber. The case is hereby assigned to the Honorable Thomas P. Barber, United States District Judge, with his consent, to conduct all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to effect transfer. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/8/2020. (AR)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Bertram Adams, Steven Andrews, James Denhardt, Marybeth Henderson, Leland Holmes, Thomas Kapper, Jeffery Neal, Mary Palmer, Town of Redington Shores, Joseph Walker Notice of Filing Defendants' Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Related Cases and Inc. MOL)(Daigneault, Jay)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer Related Cases and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Defendants. (Daigneault, Jay)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/5/2020. (TWL)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 15, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/1/2020. (LEA)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bertram Adams, Steven Andrews, James Denhardt, Marybeth Henderson, Leland Holmes, Thomas Kapper, Jeffery Neal, Mary Palmer, Town of Redington Shores, Joseph Walker. (Daigneault, Jay)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bertram Adams, Steven Andrews, James Denhardt, Marybeth Henderson, Leland Holmes, Thomas Kapper, Jeffery Neal, Mary Palmer, Town of Redington Shores, Joseph Walker. Related case(s): yes (Daigneault, Jay)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Circuit Court for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 20-004378-CI filed in State Court on 09/14/2020. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA062014 filed by Mary Palmer, Town of Redington Shores, Steven Andrews, Jeffery Neal, Leland Holmes, Marybeth Henderson, Joseph Walker, Bertram Adams, James Denhardt, Thomas Kapper. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents Acceptance of Service, #3 State Court Other Documents Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Addresses, #4 Federal Civil Cover Sheet)(JLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JERMC LTD. et al v. Town of Redington Shores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Holmes
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertram Adams
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Neal
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Redington Shores
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Andrews
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kapper
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Walker
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Palmer
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Denhardt
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Neal
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Holmes
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Adams
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybeth Henderson
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMC LTD.
Represented By: Michael Paul Beltran
Represented By: Jacqueline S. Kafedjian
Represented By: Matthew J. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMC Management, Corp.
Represented By: Michael Paul Beltran
Represented By: Jacqueline S. Kafedjian
Represented By: Matthew J. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?