Gregory v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Gregory
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 8:2020cv02642
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mark H. Tyson may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 1/6/2021. (MLM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Mark H. Tyson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17732957 for $150 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Craig, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/16/2020. (MWC)
December 16, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Stay pending Settlement with Trans Union, LLC by Patricia Gregory. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/10/2020. (MWC)
December 10, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Stay pending Settlement with Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper by Patricia Gregory. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
December 9, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Trans Union, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Patricia Gregory.(Steinmetz, Yosef)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #20 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Trans Union LLC shall have up to and including December 29, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/8/2020. (MWC)
December 8, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Epps, Alexandria) Modified text on 12/11/2020 (AG).
December 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Trans Union, LLC. Related case(s): no (Epps, Alexandria)
December 8, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Epps, Alexandria)
December 4, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Craig, Sarah) Modified text on 12/11/2020 (AG).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #15 Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC shall have up to and including December 28, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/3/2020. (MWC)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.. (Evans, Hallie)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Related case(s): no (Evans, Hallie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Evans, Hallie)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Patricia Gregory. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Patricia Gregory. Related case(s): no (Steinmetz, Yosef)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Fesnak on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Fesnak, Heather)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hallie Smith Evans on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Evans, Hallie)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall have up to and including January 15, 2021 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/25/2020. (MWC)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 11/17/2020 by Patricia Gregory as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 11/17/2020 by Patricia Gregory as to Trans Union, LLC. (Steinmetz, Yosef)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Craig, Sarah)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/20/2020. (CRB)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/20/2020. (CRB)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Renee Craig on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Craig, Sarah)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. (CRH)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2642-T-35AAS. (LRB)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Trans Union, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17538377) filed by Patricia Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Steinmetz, Yosef) Modified on 11/12/2020 to edit text (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sarah Renee Craig
Represented By: Mark H. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Alexandria Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Hallie Smith Evans
Represented By: Heather Lynn Fesnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gregory
Represented By: Yosef Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?