Kranz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Frederick Kranz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2020cv02714
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Frederick Kranz. (Avard, Carol) Modified on 1/15/2021 (TDC).
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Frederick Kranz. Related case(s): no (Avard, Carol)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/24/2020. (SRC)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to United States Attorney, Attorney General of the United States, and Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (CRH)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2714-T-60SPF. (SJB)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17564080) filed by Frederick Kranz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kranz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Kranz
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?