Valentin v. Salson Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erika Valentin
Defendant: Salson Logistics, Inc. and Terry Mays
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli and Gregory P. Holder
Case Number: 8:2020cv02741
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 21, 2021 at 1:30 P.M. before Gregory Holder. (Castillo, Ramon)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of Mr. Grilli's notice of recusal (Doc. #18), the Court appoints Gregory Holder, of Zinober Diana & Monteverde P.A., to serve as mediator in this case. Notice of mediation due January 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/14/2021. (DMD)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Peter J. Grilli Mediator's Notice of Recusal (Grilli, Peter)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/30/2020. (TWL) (TWL).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #15), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/30/2020. (TWL)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the January 2022 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/6/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/30/2020. (TWL)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Benson, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Erika Valentin. (Castillo, Ramon)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: While the Court appreciates the parties' early filing of a notice of mediation (Doc. #10), such notice is premature. The parties have not yet submitted their Case Management Report and the Court has not yet entered its Case Management and Scheduling Order. It is the Court's custom to set a mediation deadline and appoint a mediator in the Case Management and Scheduling Order and, then, direct the parties to file a notice of mediation within a few weeks of the entry of the Case Management and Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to strike the notice of mediation (Doc. #10). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/8/2020. (DMD)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Erika Valentin. Related case(s): Yes (Castillo, Ramon)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN; pursuant to court's endorsed order 12.***NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4-21-21 at 1:30 p.m. before Robert Santos. (Benson, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/9/2020 (LNR).
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Terry Mays.(Benson, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Terry Mays, Salson Logistics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Salson Logistics, Inc. for Salson Logistics, Inc. (Benson, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS report; Plaintiff's Status Report on Efforts for Service by Erika Valentin. (Castillo, Ramon)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses re #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Salson Logistics, Inc.(Petrillo, Anthony)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/25/2020. (TWL)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on her efforts to perfect service of process on Defendant Terry Mays by November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/20/2020. (DMD)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by December 11, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/20/2020. (DMD)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-2741-T-33CPT. (SJB)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-003143 filed in State Court on 10/14/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17578025 filed by Salson Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Demand, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - State Court Pleadings, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 State Court Other Documents)(Benson, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentin v. Salson Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salson Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Benson
Represented By: Anthony J. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Mays
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Benson
Represented By: Anthony J. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Valentin
Represented By: Ramon A. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gregory P. Holder
Represented By: Gregory P. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?