Blair et al v. Barnett Outdoors, LLC
Plaintiff: James Blair and Tamara Blair
Defendant: Barnett Outdoors LLC and Barnett Outdoors, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02745
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant Barnett Outdoors, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Barnett Outdoors, LLC.(Fulton, Robert)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 9/12/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Jury Trial set for the February 2023 trial term commencing 2/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/11/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/17/2020. (SAO)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Fulton, Robert)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice by Barnett Outdoors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Plano Synergy Holding Inc. for Barnett Outdoors, LLC. (Fulton, Robert)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Barnett Outdoors, LLC. Related case(s): no (Fulton, Robert)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Blair, Tamara Blair. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saunders, Joseph)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/1/2020. (SAO)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole D. Walsh on behalf of Barnett Outdoors, LLC. (Walsh, Nicole)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Fulton on behalf of Barnett Outdoors, LLC. (Fulton, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER of service returned executed on 11/24/20 by Barnett Outdoors, LLC as to Barnett Outdoors, LLC. (Fulton, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Barnett Outdoors, LLC. (JLD)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2745-T-02AAS. (SJB)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barnett Outdoors, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17579135) filed by Tamara Blair, James Blair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saunders, Joseph) Modified on 11/23/2020 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair et al v. Barnett Outdoors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blair
Represented By: Joseph H. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Blair
Represented By: Joseph H. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnett Outdoors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnett Outdoors, LLC
Represented By: Nicole D. Walsh
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?