Clementson v. Super Petroleum 11, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRITNEE CLEMENTSON
Defendant: SUPER PETROLEUM 12 LLC doing business as MARATHON GASOLINE, SUPER PETROLEUM 11 LLC doing business as MARATHON GASOLINE, MOHAMMAD AZAM, Super Petroleum 11, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Marathon Gasoline and Super Petroleum 12 LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Marathon Gasoline
Case Number: 8:2020cv02792
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the #5 Notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/30/2020. (CCB)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Britnee Clementson (Bober, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Super Petroleum 11, LLC, Super Petroleum 12, LLC and Mohammad Azam (Bilotta, Joseph) Modified on 12/23/2020 Added defendants (BES).
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Mohammad Azam, Super Petroleum 11, LLC, and Super Petroleum 12 LLC. (JLD)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2792-T-02SPF. (SJB)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17595575) filed by Britnee Clementson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bober, Peter) Modified on 11/30/2020 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clementson v. Super Petroleum 11, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITNEE CLEMENTSON
Represented By: Peter Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPER PETROLEUM 12 LLC doing business as MARATHON GASOLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPER PETROLEUM 11 LLC doing business as MARATHON GASOLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMAD AZAM
Represented By: Joseph Bilotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Petroleum 11, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Marathon Gasoline
Represented By: Joseph Bilotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Petroleum 12 LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Marathon Gasoline
Represented By: Joseph Bilotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?