Haskew v. United States Marshal
Petitioner: John Michael Haskew
Respondent: U.S. Marshal and United States Marshal
Case Number: 8:2020cv02864
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Dismissal by John Michael Haskew. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CRH)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 12/14/2020. (SRC)
December 9, 2020 FEES paid by John Michael Haskew (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number TPA062634) (JLD)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by John Michael Haskew. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope).(BSN)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by John Michael Haskew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter Regarding Payment, #3 Mailing Envelope) Filing fee not paid and no IFP motion filed.(JLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskew v. United States Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Michael Haskew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?