Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V. et al v. Always Fresh Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. and Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: Wayne Giddings, Matthew Giddings and Always Fresh Farms, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02875
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
2 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #32 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including February 8, 2021 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/29/2021. (APF)
January 28, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #30 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. Related case(s): yes (Bronson, Ardith) Modified on 1/29/2021 (TDC).
January 28, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #31 Interested persons order by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. identifying Other Affiliate Giddings Fruit S.A., Other Affiliate Giddings Cerasus S.A., Other Affiliate Giddings Farms S.A., Other Affiliate Fine Fruit S.A., Other Affiliate Giddings Berries USA LLC, Other Affiliate Giddings Fruit Company UK, Other Affiliate Giddings Shanghai Trade Company, Other Affiliate Giddings Fruit USA LLC, Other Affiliate Inv. Mexicanas S.A., Other Affiliate SB Agroquimicos S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Inv. CG Corporativo SC, Other Affiliate Black Venture Farms S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Agricola Rapu Nui S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Agricola Sierras de America S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Comercializadora Berries de Occidente for Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified on 1/29/2021 (TDC).
January 28, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #30 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. Related case(s): yes (Feather, Scott)
January 28, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #31 Interested persons order by Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. (Feather, Scott)
January 27, 2021 Filing 32 Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. (Feather, Scott) Modified on 1/28/2021 (TDC).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2021. (CRB)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2021. (CRB)
December 29, 2020 Filing 29 Case Reassigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. New case number: 8:20-cv-2875-T-35TGW. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER of recusal. The undersigned recuses himself from all further participation in this case. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/28/2020. (SMB)
December 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence H. Meuers on behalf of Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings (Meuers, Lawrence)
December 23, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. (Feather, Scott)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to January 28, 2021. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/23/2020. (SMB)
December 23, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Dupre on behalf of Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings (Dupre, Steven)
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. (Feather, Scott)
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. Related case(s): yes (Feather, Scott)
December 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Feather on behalf of Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings (Feather, Scott)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C.. Related case(s): yes (Bronson, Ardith)
December 15, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on December 9, 2020 by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C., Giddings Berries Chile S.A. as to Matthew Giddings. (Bronson, Ardith)
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on December 8, 2020 by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C., Giddings Berries Chile S.A. as to Wayne Giddings. (Bronson, Ardith)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on December 8, 2020 by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C., Giddings Berries Chile S.A. as to Always Fresh Farms, LLC. (Bronson, Ardith)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT USED-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified on 12/15/2020 (LSS).
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT USED-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified on 12/15/2020 (LSS).
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT USED-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified on 12/15/2020 (LSS).
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. identifying Corporate Parent Giddings Fruit S.A. for Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (AG).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Craig M. Waugh to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (SMB)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Mary E. Gately to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (SMB)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Craig M. Waugh to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17637624 for $150 by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bronson, Ardith) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Mary E. Gately to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17636574 for $150 by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bronson, Ardith) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Craig M. Waugh and Mary E. Gately of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Matthew Giddings, Wayne Giddings. (AG)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/7/2020. (KAC)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (AG).
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (AG).
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V., Giddings Berries Chile S.A., Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C. (Bronson, Ardith) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (AG).
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-2875-T-30TGW. (SJB)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17625801) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bronson, Ardith) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (AG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V. et al v. Always Fresh Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Giddings
Represented By: Lawrence H. Meuers
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: Scott D. Feather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Giddings
Represented By: Lawrence H. Meuers
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: Scott D. Feather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Always Fresh Farms, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence H. Meuers
Represented By: Steven C. Dupre
Represented By: Scott D. Feather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giddings Berries Chile S.A.
Represented By: Ardith Bronson
Represented By: Craig M. Waugh
Represented By: Mary E. Gately
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giddings Berries Peru S.A.C.
Represented By: Ardith Bronson
Represented By: Craig M. Waugh
Represented By: Mary E. Gately
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fruits-Giddings S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Ardith Bronson
Represented By: Craig M. Waugh
Represented By: Mary E. Gately
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?