Herendeen v. Regions Bank
Appellee: Regions Bank
Appellant: Christine Herendeen
In Re: YJNK II, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02892
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: consolidating this action with Lead Case No. 8:20-cv-2891-T-23; all further filings must occur in 8:20-cv-2891-T-23. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/13/2021. (BK)
January 13, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 8:20-cv-02891-SDM. (MCB)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH NEW LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2021. (GSO)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Regions Bank Notice of Filing Joint Motion to Consolidate Sixteen Related Appeal Cases (Warren, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Regions Bank of Filing Joint Motion to Transfer Appeal Case to the First-Filed Related Appeal Case (Warren, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Christine Herendeen. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:13-bk-06869-CED. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(MCB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020: #2 Amended Barnkruptcy Transmittal) (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herendeen v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Regions Bank
Represented By: Edmund S. Whitson, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christine Herendeen
Represented By: James D. Gassenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: YJNK II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?