Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC v. United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc., MultiPlan, Inc. and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02964
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases listed in Rule 3.02(d). These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change in Local Rules. (BGS)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER denying #27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File response to Multiplan's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause because no additional briefing is needed. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/27/2021. (JDE)
January 26, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #17 Order to show cause by Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Authority)(Fineberg, Justin)
January 22, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendant MultiPlan, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause, or, In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Submit Briefing on Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fineberg, Justin) Modified event and text on 1/22/2021 (MCB).
January 21, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #17 Order to show cause filed by MultiPlan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jane Stalinski)(Feldman, Bret) Modified text on 1/22/2021 (MCB).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #17 Order to show cause. Response due by 1/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/11/2021. (Flynn, Sean)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Order to show cause by MultiPlan, Inc.. (Feldman, Bret) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 the parties' consent Motion to abate deadlines other than briefing related to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/8/2021. (JDE)
January 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E. Siegelaub on behalf of Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC (Siegelaub, Jonathan)
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of filing of Declaration in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. (Peoples, Gera) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (MCB).
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of filing of Declaration in Support of #19MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. (Peoples, Gera) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (MCB).
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and UMR, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. (Bassel Frick, Irene) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (MCB).
January 4, 2021 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Extend and Abate All Deadlines other than Briefing Related to the Court's Order to Show Cause by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. (Bassel Frick, Irene) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (MCB).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED: Defendant MultiPlan, Inc. shall SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded to the Circuit Court for the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond to this Order will result in remand without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/31/2020. (JDE)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC. Related case(s): yes (LeBlanc, Rachel)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC. (LeBlanc, Rachel)
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. Related case(s): y (Peoples, Gera)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. (Peoples, Gera)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by MultiPlan, Inc.. Related case(s): Y (Feldman, Bret)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by MultiPlan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MultiPlan Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent MultiPlan Corporation for MultiPlan, Inc... (Feldman, Bret)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Errol J. King and Katherine C. Mannino may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Multiplan, Inc., with Attorney Bret M. Feldman designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Please note that a local attorney must also be present for any evidentiary hearing before the district judge and during trial. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Katherine C. Mannino shall comply with the electronic filing requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/17/2020. (CKR)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responses to Complaint. Responses due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/16/2020. (CKR)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Katherine C. Mannino to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17667419 for $150 by MultiPlan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Feldman, Bret) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 12/16/2020 (MCB).
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Errol J. King to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17667337 for $150 by MultiPlan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Feldman, Bret) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 12/16/2020 (MCB).
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by MultiPlan, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. (Bassel Frick, Irene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 12/15/2020 (MCB).
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Jonathan Sieglaub of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/14/2020. (BGS)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/14/2020. (BGS)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2964-T-36SPF. (SJB)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 20-CA-008606 filed in State Court on 11/2/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17655947 filed by MultiPlan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit D - Other State Court Documents)(Feldman, Bret) Modified on 12/14/2020 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC v. United Healthcare of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Gera R. Peoples
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Gera R. Peoples
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MultiPlan, Inc.
Represented By: Bret M. Feldman
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Represented By: Katherine C. Mannino
Represented By: Errol J. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Gera R. Peoples
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf-To-Bay Anesthesiology Associates, LLC
Represented By: Alan David Lash
Represented By: Jonathan E. Siegelaub
Represented By: Justin C. Fineberg
Represented By: Rachel Holladay LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?